CARTER v. LANDSTAR INWAY INC. et al
Plaintiff: LARAE CARTER
Defendant: DAVID SKIP O'CONNOR, LANDSTAR INWAY INC. and JOHN DOES 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv10701
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/7/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 12/30/2020. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/22/2020. (tf, )
September 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 9/22/2020. (sb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DAVID SKIP O'CONNOR.(JENNINGS, DAWN)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LANDSTAR INWAY INC..(JENNINGS, DAWN)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 9/22/2020 at 11:30 A.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket or emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/10/2020. (slc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JON MICHAEL DUMONT on behalf of LANDSTAR INWAY INC. (DUMONT, JON)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LANDSTAR INWAY INC.. (JENNINGS, DAWN)
August 18, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/22/2020 11:30 AM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 08/18/2020. (pr, )
August 18, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LANDSTAR INWAY INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey Gloucester County, case number L-872-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11224673), filed by LANDSTAR INWAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(JENNINGS, DAWN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. LANDSTAR INWAY INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SKIP O'CONNOR
Represented By: DAWN L. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANDSTAR INWAY INC.
Represented By: DAWN L. JENNINGS
Represented By: JON MICHAEL DUMONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARAE CARTER
Represented By: ROBERT J. HENSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?