ADAIR v. CASTALDI al
Plaintiff: STACY RUBERTON and RYAN ADAIR
Defendant: ABC CORP., #1-10, UNITED STATES POST OFFICE, JOHN DOE #1-10 and KERI CASTALDI
Case Number: 1:2020cv10792
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
2 Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Government's request for one additional week to file the motion to dismiss from 10/15/2020 to 10/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/16/2020. (tf, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from AUSA Jane Dattilo. (DATTILO, JANE)
September 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference by phone held on 9/23/2020. (se, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court having held an initial conference by phone on September 23, 2020, it is hereby ORDERED defendant shall file its motion to dismiss by October 15, 2020. It is further ORDERED that with the consent of counsel all discovery is STAYED until defendants motion is decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/23/20. (Shaw, A).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court is prepared to proceed with the initial conference scheduled on September 23, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. via telephone. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/21/20. (Shaw, A)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by KERI CASTALDI, UNITED STATES POST OFFICE.(DATTILO, JANE)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - An Initial Scheduling Conference by phone is scheduled for 9/23/2020 at 11:00 AM. The call-in number is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/16/2020. (se, )
September 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio no longer assigned to case. (mmb, )
September 15, 2020 NOTICE: The telephonic initial scheduling conference on 9/22/2020 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED; TO BE RESET. (slc)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 9/22/2020 at 12:00 P.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket or emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/10/2020. (slc)
August 19, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/22/2020 12:00 PM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/19/2020. (cry, )
August 19, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, )
August 19, 2020 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ATL-L-000065-20., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Decl. of A. Ruymann, #3 Exhibit Letter to Superior Court)(DATTILO, JANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAIR v. CASTALDI al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP., #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POST OFFICE
Represented By: JANE DATTILO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERI CASTALDI
Represented By: JANE DATTILO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY RUBERTON
Represented By: JONATHAN ANDREW FENDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN ADAIR
Represented By: JONATHAN ANDREW FENDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?