HUNTER v. LASMILE LOGISTICS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL HUNTER
Defendant: KALYAN SESHAN and LASMILE LOGISTICS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv12819
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by NATHANIEL HUNTER (ARORA, MANALI)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time to answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 11/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/4/2020. (rss, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (JAITLY, VIKAS)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting request to extend the time in which Defendants Lasmile Logistics, LLC and Kalyan Seshan may answer Plaintiff's complaint to 11/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/21/2020. (rtm, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (JAITLY, VIKAS)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by VIKAS C. JAITLY on behalf of All Defendants (JAITLY, VIKAS)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATHANIEL HUNTER. KALYAN SESHAN served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (ARORA, MANALI)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATHANIEL HUNTER. LASMILE LOGISTICS, LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (ARORA, MANALI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LASMILE LOGISTICS, LLC, KALYAN SESHAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LASMILE LOGISTICS, LLC, KALYAN SESHAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11374317) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NATHANIEL HUNTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ARORA, MANALI)
September 18, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (bf, )
September 18, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences (RMB). #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUNTER v. LASMILE LOGISTICS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KALYAN SESHAN
Represented By: VIKAS C. JAITLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASMILE LOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By: VIKAS C. JAITLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL HUNTER
Represented By: MANALI SHAH ARORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?