TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS v. B&B HI-TECH SOLUTIONS, LLC
Petitioner: TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS
Respondent: B&B HI-TECH SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv13299
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 JUDGMENT in favor of TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS against B&B HI-TECH SOLUTIONS, LLC ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 11/16/2020. (rtm, )
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND JUDGMENT granting #2 Motion to Confirm Arbitration award issued by the Honorable Joel A. Pisano on 5/19/2020. ORDERED that Respondent shall make payments to the funds in the amount of $1,242.40, plus the total cost of the per diem penalty, for a cumulative total amount of $14,142.40 etc. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 11/16/2020. (rtm, )
September 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pr, )
September 25, 2020 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS. (GIBLIN, VINCENT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS. (Attachments: #1 Statement That No Brief is Necessary, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GIBLIN, VINCENT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11409639.), filed by TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(GIBLIN, VINCENT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS v. B&B HI-TECH SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B&B HI-TECH SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS
Represented By: VINCENT M. GIBLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?