WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY v. ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Plaintiff: WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv14361
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (FOGLER, MICHAEL)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, DAVID)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JUSTIN F. JOHNSON terminated. Attorney MICHAEL FOGLER for ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC added.. (FOGLER, MICHAEL)
November 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JOHNSON, JUSTIN)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
October 13, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (SCOTT, DAVID)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11494912), filed by WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCOTT, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY v. ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID RYAN SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ND REMY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: JUSTIN F. JOHNSON
Represented By: MICHAEL FOGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?