Thomas v. Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: JASON THOMAS
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN N.V., AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., AUROLIFE PHARMA LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. and ACETRIS HEALTH, LLC
In Re: VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv15091
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 Short Form Complaint by JASON THOMAS. (MORGAN, SCOTT)
October 28, 2020 For all Case Management Orders #click here (dd, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, )
October 28, 2020 Case transferred from Illinois Northern pursuant to CTO-33 for MDL 2875 (dd, )
October 28, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04096. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the District of New Jersey the electronic record. (ec, )
October 23, 2020 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2875 Conditional Transfer Order filed 10/23/2020. (ec, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to District of New Jersey. (ec, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 11/5/2020 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 10/28/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jason Thomas by Scott Anthony Morgan (Morgan, Scott)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morgan, Scott)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 (PDF illegible) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jason Thomas by Scott Anthony Morgan (Morgan, Scott) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bg, ).
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 (PDF illegible) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morgan, Scott) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bg, ).
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jason Thomas; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17207313.(Morgan, Scott)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice.(bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROLIFE PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACETRIS HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON THOMAS
Represented By: SCOTT MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?