GALLO v. ORTIZ
Petitioner: LOUIS N. GALLO, III
Respondent: DAVID E. ORTIZ
Case Number: 1:2020cv16416
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Respondent shall file a supplemental answer to the Petition within 14 days of the date of this order, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/6/2021. (rtm, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 Exhibit to #8 Reply to Response (NOT Motion) by LOUIS N. GALLO, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rtm, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #4 Response to Habeas Petition,. (rtm, )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Seal Document #5 on the docket. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/1/2020. (rtm, )
December 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Seal Document #5 Exhibit (to Document),, Medical Records. Motion set for 1/4/2021 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Document #5 Exhibit (to Document),, Medical Records by DAVID E. ORTIZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane Dattilo, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DATTILO, JANE)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit to #4 Response to Habeas Petition, Medical Records by DAVID E. ORTIZ. (DATTILO, JANE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DAVID E. ORTIZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Reiser, #2 Exhibit 1-12 to Reiser Declaration, #3 Exhibit 13-15 to Reiser Declaration, #4 Exhibit 16 Part I to Reiser Declaration, #5 Exhibit 16 Part II through 18 to Reiser Declaration, #6 Declaration of Dr. Turner-Foster, #7 Declaration of A. Sassman, #8 Declaration of C. Dobovich)(DATTILO, JANE)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JANE DATTILO on behalf of DAVID E. ORTIZ (DATTILO, JANE)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER Respondent shall file an answer within 7 days of the date of entry of this order, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/19/2020. (rtm, )(nm)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus COVID-19 ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number TRE115588.), filed by LOUIS N. GALLO, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALLO v. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID E. ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: JANE DATTILO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LOUIS N. GALLO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?