MAZAHREH et al v. GREWAL et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA, BRIAN SWENSON, COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION and AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH
Defendant: MARK P. TARANTINO, THOMAS BRYAN, GURBIR GREWAL, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, RICHARD J. MEDER, ROBERT BRENNAN, JOSEPH L. REA and N. PETER CONFORTI
Case Number: 1:2020cv17598
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Clerk's Text Order - The document #15 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THOMAS BRYAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/16/2021. (dmr)
January 27, 2021 Clerk's Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH L. REA, N. PETER CONFORTI, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, MARK P. TARANTINO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/19/2021. (dmr)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants, Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C., Hon. Mark P. Tarantino, J.S.C., Hon. Joseph L. Rea, J.S.C... (LUCAS, BRYAN)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Request to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Attorney MALCOLM X. THORPE for THOMAS BRYAN added. (THORPE, MALCOLM)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MALCOLM X. THORPE on behalf of THOMAS BRYAN (THORPE, MALCOLM)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GRANT W. MCGUIRE on behalf of THOMAS BRYAN (MCGUIRE, GRANT)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM W. NORTHGRAVE on behalf of THOMAS BRYAN (NORTHGRAVE, WILLIAM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN CHARLES GILLESPIE on behalf of RICHARD J. MEDER (GILLESPIE, JOHN)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS on behalf of PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH L. REA, MARK P. TARANTINO (LUCAS, BRYAN)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, BRIAN SWENSON, BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA, AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. THOMAS BRYAN waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, BRIAN SWENSON, BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA, AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. N. PETER CONFORTI waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, BRIAN SWENSON, BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA, AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. JOSEPH L. REA waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, BRIAN SWENSON, BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA, AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. MARK P. TARANTINO waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, BRIAN SWENSON, BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA, AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. PATRICK J. CALLAHAN waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, BRIAN SWENSON, BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA, AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. GURBIR GREWAL waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ROBERT BRENNAN, THOMAS BRYAN, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, RICHARD J. MEDER, JOSEPH L. REA, MARK P. TARANTINO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
December 2, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Additional party information included in the caption of the complaint should be listed in party text . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
December 2, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences (RMB). #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
December 1, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT BRENNAN, THOMAS BRYAN, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, RICHARD J. MEDER, JOSEPH L. REA, MARK P. TARANTINO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11740612), filed by COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, BRIAN SWENSON, BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA, AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAZAHREH et al v. GREWAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK P. TARANTINO
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS BRYAN
Represented By: MALCOLM X. THORPE
Represented By: GRANT W. MCGUIRE
Represented By: WILLIAM W. NORTHGRAVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR GREWAL
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK J. CALLAHAN
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD J. MEDER
Represented By: JOHN CHARLES GILLESPIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH L. REA
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. PETER CONFORTI
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY NUNES DE ALMEIDA
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN SWENSON
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AL-AMEEN I. MAZAHREH
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?