ATLANTIC ER PHYSICIANS TEAM PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATES, PA et al v. UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MIDDLESEX EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PA, ATLANTIC ER PHYSICIANS TEAM PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATES, PLAINFIELD EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PA, EMERGENCY CARE SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY, PA, EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, PC, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY, PA, EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES OF NORTH JERSEY, PC and ATLANTIC ER PHYSICIANS TEAM PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATES, PA
Defendant: UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC. and MULTIPLAN, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20083
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County. Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of George P. Barbatsuly, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-Q to Declaration of George P. Barbatsuly, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAROCCO, ANTHONY)
February 2, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MULTIPLAN, INC., UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC., filed by MIDDLESEX EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PA, EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES OF NORTH JERSEY, PC, PLAINFIELD EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PA, EMERGENCY CARE SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY, PA, ATLANTIC ER PHYSICIANS TEAM PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATES, PA, EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, PC, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY, PA.(LAROCCO, ANTHONY)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of the parties' pre-motion letters and responses. [Docket Nos. 14, 15, 17, 18, 21.] It appears that a pre-motion conference would not be productive at this time. Instead, Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint, to which no Defendant has objected, by no later than February 3, 2021. Thereafter, Plaintiffs shall file their Motion to Remand, should they so desire, by no later than February 17, 2021. Upon the resolution of that Motion, Defendants will be permitted to re-file their pre-motion letters regarding their anticipated Motions to Dismiss, should they so desire. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 01/29/2021. (Costigan, Roberta)
January 26, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Francis X. Manning re #18 Letter. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 26, 2021 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, the initial scheduling conference on 2/2/2021 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED and will be reset at a later date. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/26/2021. (slc)
January 26, 2021 Filing 19 Letter from Francis X. Manning. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 Letter from Anthony P. La Rocco re #14 Letter, #15 Letter. (LAROCCO, ANTHONY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from Anthony P. La Rocco requesting Pre-Motion Conference relating to Anticipated Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint (redline))(LAROCCO, ANTHONY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC ER PHYSICIANS TEAM PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATES, PA, EMERGENCY CARE SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY, PA, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY, PA, EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES OF NORTH JERSEY, PC, EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, PC, MIDDLESEX EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PA, PLAINFIELD EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PA identifying none as Corporate Parent.. (LAROCCO, ANTHONY)
January 12, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Errol King, Craig L. Caesar and Katie Mannino: $ 450, receipt number CAM012069 (tf, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 Letter from Rachel R. Hager Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. (HAGER, RACHEL)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Francis X. Manning. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 2/2/2021 at 10:00 A.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket or, alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/7/2021. (slc)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katie Mannino, Esq., shall each pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/6/2021. (tf, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Craig L. Caesar, Esq., shall each pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/6/2021. (tf, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Errol King, Esq., shall each pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/6/2021. (tf, )
December 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katie Mannino, Esq.. Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katie Mannino, Esq. by MULTIPLAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katie Mannino ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of R. Hager ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HAGER, RACHEL)
December 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Errol King, Esq., #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Craig L. Caesar, Esq.. Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Craig L. Caesar, Esq. by MULTIPLAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Craig L. Caesar ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of R. Hager ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HAGER, RACHEL)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Errol King, Esq. by MULTIPLAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Errol King ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of R. Hager ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HAGER, RACHEL)
December 23, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MULTIPLAN, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/11/2021. (tf, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant MultiPlan, Inc... (HAGER, RACHEL)
December 22, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/11/2021. (tf, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying United Healthcare Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Response to the Complaint. Attorney FRANCIS X. MANNING for UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC.,FRANCIS X. MANNING for UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY added. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
December 22, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
December 22, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:00 AM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/22/2020. (cry, )
December 22, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences (RMB). #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
December 21, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. AMENDED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC. from Superior Court of Gloucester County, NJ, case number GLO-l-001196-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11857422), filed by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Executed Consent to Remove, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - SoS Record, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration Declaration of Jane Stalinski, #7 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Jane Stalinski)(MANNING, FRANCIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATLANTIC ER PHYSICIANS TEAM PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATES, PA et al v. UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIDDLESEX EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PA
Represented By: ANTHONY P. LAROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC ER PHYSICIANS TEAM PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLAINFIELD EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PA
Represented By: ANTHONY P. LAROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERGENCY CARE SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY, PA
Represented By: ANTHONY P. LAROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, PC
Represented By: ANTHONY P. LAROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY, PA
Represented By: ANTHONY P. LAROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES OF NORTH JERSEY, PC
Represented By: ANTHONY P. LAROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC ER PHYSICIANS TEAM PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATES, PA
Represented By: ANTHONY P. LAROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTIPLAN, INC.
Represented By: RACHEL R. HAGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?