OSBORNE v. ORTIZ
Petitioner: BRYAN AARON OSBORNE
Respondent: DAVID E. ORTIZ
Case Number: 1:2020cv20561
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO on behalf of DAVID E. ORTIZ (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VASSALLO, KRISTIN)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from BRYAN OSBORNE. (pr, )
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Respondent may file a Motion to Dismiss within twenty-one (21) days of the date this Order is filed; if Respondent does not file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition, the Respondent shall file a full and complete answer within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/18/2021. (tf, n.m.)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from BRYAN AARON OSBORNE; re: deprived of rights. (tf, )
January 29, 2021 REOPENING CASE: The Clerk is in receipt of the re Filing Fee Received filed on 01/28/2021 and hereby reopens the case for review by a Judicial Officer. (dpw)
January 28, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number CAM012144 (pr, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by BRYAN AARON OSBORNE. (tf, )
January 19, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (pr, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case and supply Petitioner with a blank IFP application; If Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order etc.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/19/2021. (pr,n.m)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/19/2021. (pr,n.m)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus COVID-19, filed by BRYAN AARON OSBORNE. NO IFP/FF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 ENVELOPE)(pr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSBORNE v. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID E. ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRYAN AARON OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?