JONES-JOHNSON et al v. TARGET CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH JOHNSON and TERRI JONES-JOHNSON
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORP. 1-3, JOHN DOE INC. 1-3, TARGET CORPORATION and TARGET CORPORATION doing business as TARGET STORE T-2104
Case Number: 1:2021cv00275
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service, #2 Medical Record)(VITALE, NICOLE)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE VITALE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (VITALE, NICOLE)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by TARGET CORPORATION.(PETRYCKI, JOHN)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDERED that Plaintiffs show cause, within three weeks of the date of this order, for justification of the demand for damages. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/10/2021. (dmr)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The phone conference currently scheduled for February 10, 2021 is hereby moved to March 17, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/15/21. (Shaw, A).
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TARGET CORPORATION.(PETRYCKI, JOHN)
January 7, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, )
January 7, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 2/10/2021 09:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/7/2021. (pr, )
January 7, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences. RMB #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (pr, )
January 7, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TARGET CORPORATION identifying Target Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (PETRYCKI, JOHN)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TARGET CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey Burlington County, case number BUR-L-2368-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11937128), filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(PETRYCKI, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES-JOHNSON et al v. TARGET CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORP. 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE INC. 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN V. PETRYCKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION doing business as TARGET STORE T-2104
Represented By: JOHN V. PETRYCKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH JOHNSON
Represented By: EDITH A. PEARCE
Represented By: NICOLE VITALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI JONES-JOHNSON
Represented By: EDITH A. PEARCE
Represented By: NICOLE VITALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?