GLAZEWSKI v. HICKS et al
Petitioner: VINCENT W. GLAZEWSKI
Respondent: JOHN ROES, 1-10, JOHN DOES, 1-10, MARCUS O. HICKS, JUDITH PERSISCHILLI and GEORGE ROBINSON
Case Number: 1:2021cv02408
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from VINCENT W. GLAZEWSKI dated 3/24/2021. (dmr)
March 29, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (pr, )
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case and supply Petitioner with a blank IFP application; If Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/29/2021. (pr,n.m)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by VINCENT W. GLAZEWSKI. NO IFP/FF. (Attachments: #1 ENVELOPE, #2 Exhibit)(pr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLAZEWSKI v. HICKS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN ROES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARCUS O. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JUDITH PERSISCHILLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GEORGE ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VINCENT W. GLAZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?