SAMPSON et al v. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: James Sampson, Shirley Reinhard, Joanne Fulgieri Ventura, Anthony Ventura, Elizabeth Wheatley and Laura Sampson
Defendant: INC. SUBARU OF AMERICA, Subaru Corporation f/k/a Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd., SUBARU CORPORATION, SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. and FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10284
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice UNOPPOSED by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Homer B. Ramsey in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of Michael B. Gallub in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RAMSEY, HOMER)
June 25, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice UNOPPOSED. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motions #6 , #7 shall file an amended certified statement of the applicant "disclosing each bar in which the applicant is a member in good standing including the year of admission and the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members of its bar" as set forth in the amendment to L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1) (eff. March 1, 2010); or in lieu thereof, may attach a certificate of good standing. See www.njd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/24/2021. (Kaplan, C)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.'S TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT to 7/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/12/2021. (rss, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by HOMER B. RAMSEY on behalf of SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Subaru of America, Inc. and Subaru Corporation f/k/a Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. on 04/29/2021, filed by SHIRLEY REINHARD, JAMES SAMPSON, LAURA SAMPSON, ANTHONY VENTURA, JOANNE FULGIERI VENTURA, ELIZABETH WHEATLEY. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tarek H. Zohdy by All Plaintiffs. (Park, Amey)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cody R. Padgett by All Plaintiffs. (Park, Amey)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WEINMANN, STEVEN)
May 5, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cody R. Padgett, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tarek H. Zohdy. Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amey J. Park on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Park, Amey)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL GERTNER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GERTNER, ABIGAIL)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUBARU CORPORATION, SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
April 28, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences. RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (pr, )
April 28, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Other . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
April 27, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (mmb, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INC. SUBARU OF AMERICA, Subaru Corporation f/k/a Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12414144) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Shirley Reinhard, Laura Sampson, Joanne Fulgieri Ventura, Anthony Ventura, James Sampson, Elizabeth Wheatley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PAUL, RUSSELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAMPSON et al v. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INC. SUBARU OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru Corporation f/k/a Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUBARU CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: HOMER B. RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sampson
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN
Represented By: ABIGAIL GERTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Reinhard
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN
Represented By: ABIGAIL GERTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Fulgieri Ventura
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN
Represented By: ABIGAIL GERTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ventura
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN
Represented By: ABIGAIL GERTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wheatley
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN
Represented By: ABIGAIL GERTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Sampson
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN
Represented By: ABIGAIL GERTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?