BELSKIS v. ORTIZ et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS
Defendant: KEVIN CASSANO, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, BARRY WISLER, DPM, FNU KODGER, MD, FNU HACZYNSKI, DAVID ORTIZ and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv10322
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 85 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Maine; Case Number 2:19-cv-00483. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Dismiss; granting #59 Motion to Change Venue; granting #81 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Motion re #70 MOTION for Leave to File Late Answer filed by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Information Resolution Form - 10/01/2010, #2 Exhibit B - Information Resolution Form - 11/18/2014, #3 Exhibit C - Second B - Information Resolution Form - 11/18/2014, #4 Exhibit D - Medical Duty Status, #5 Exhibit E - Acknowledgement of Administrative Claim, #6 Exhibit F - Information Resolution Form - 11/07/2014, #7 Envelope)(meh)
March 5, 2021 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Katelyn Saner)(SANER, KATELYN)
March 1, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by BARRY WISLER, DPM Responses due by 3/22/2021. (WERTHEIMER, RACHEL). Added MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on 3/1/2021 (jgd).
March 1, 2021 Filing 80 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BARRY WISLER, DPM.(WERTHEIMER, RACHEL)
February 27, 2021 Per Order #78 set Answer Deadline for BARRY WISLER, DPM: Answer due by 3/5/2021. (mlm)
February 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying #73 Motion for Entry of Default. The Court has granted Defendant leave to file a late answer. (Order, ECF No. 78.) A default, therefore, is not warranted. Any objection to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to File Late Answer. Although Plaintiff did not file a response to the motion, the Court notes Plaintiff's request for the entry of a default. (ECF No. 73.) Upon review of Defendant's motion and Plaintiff's motion for default, the Court finds good cause to permit the late answer. Defendant shall file the answer separately on the docket on or before March 5, 2021. Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 24, 2021 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by BARRY WISLER, DPM. Reply due by 3/10/2021. (WERTHEIMER, RACHEL)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying #72 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court discerns no reason to reconsider its orders denying Plaintiff's prior requests for the appointment of counsel. (Orders, ECF Nos. 4, 30, 34. 63.) Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 22, 2021 Filing 75 LEGAL CLAIM by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS. (jgd)
February 22, 2021 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS. Reply due by 3/8/2021. (jgd)
February 22, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION for Entry of Default as to BARRY WISLER, DPM by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS. Responses due by 3/15/2021. (jgd)
February 22, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS Responses due by 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jgd)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: Responses to #70 MOTION for Leave to File Late Answer shall be filed by 2/25/2021. No reply allowed. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm)
February 12, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Late Answer by BARRY WISLER, DPM Responses due by 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration B. Wisler, #2 Exhibit Declaration E. Wisler, #3 Exhibit Declaration K. Wolf, #4 Exhibit Answer to Complaint)(WOLF, KAREN)
February 11, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #59 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue per Order No. 69: Responses due by 2/22/2021. (jgd)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #68 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has had approximately three months to file a response to the motion. In the most recent order granting Plaintiff an extension of time to respond, the Court informed Plaintiff that absent compelling circumstances, the Court did not anticipate granting a further extension. In his motion, Plaintiff does not present compelling circumstances for a further extension. (Order, ECF No. 66.) Because the current deadline is February 12, 2021, and because Plaintiff will receive this order by regular mail and thus will likely not learn of the Court's decision until after the deadline, the Court will extend the time to February 22, 2021, to permit Plaintiff the opportunity to respond after he learns that the Court will not extend the deadline for the time he requested. Any objection to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 10, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION to Extend Time by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm)
February 5, 2021 Set Deadlines: No answer or responsive pleading having been filed Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 3/8/2021 as to defendant BARRY WISLER, DPM. (jgd)
January 14, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for Barry Wisler: Answer due by 2/4/2021. (mlm)
January 14, 2021 Filing 67 USMS Process Receipt Returned Executed as to BARRY WISLER, DPM; served on 1/14/2021. (mlm)
January 7, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #59 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 2/12/2021 per Order #66. (mlm)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part #65 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to February 12, 2021. Absent compelling circumstances, the Court does not anticipate granting a further extension of the deadline. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 6, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION to Extend Time by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm)
January 6, 2021 Filing 64 Summons Issued as to BARRY WISLER, DPM. Summons FORM and Complaint delivered to USMS for in-person service. (mlm)
December 2, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #59 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue per Order No. 62: Responses due by 12/31/2020. (jgd)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying #61 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court discerns no reason to reconsider its orders denying Plaintiff's prior request for the appointment of counsel. (Orders, ECF Nos. 30, 34.) Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Extend Time. The Court construes the motion to request additional time to file a response to Defendants' motion to dismiss. The time is extended to December 31, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 30, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS Responses due by 12/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm) Modified on 12/2/2020 to correct date filed (jgd).
November 30, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Extend Time to Seek Help by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS Responses due by 12/21/2020. (mlm)
November 12, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Change Venue by KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Responses due by 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Corrie Dobovich)(SANER, KATELYN). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 11/12/2020 (jgd).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Page Limit. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 2, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Page Limit by KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Responses due by 11/23/2020. (SANER, KATELYN)
November 2, 2020 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents (waivers) completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service (#56) as to defendant Barry Wisler, DPM. (jgd)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Service. Service shall be attempted at the address included on the Process Receipt (ECF No. 48). If service is unsuccessful at that address, Plaintiff must provide a new address. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying #50 Motion for Service on the Owners of County Podiatry Associates. The "Owners of County Podiatry Associates" is not a named party to this action. Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying #51 Motion for All County Podiatry Assoc. Contracts. The Court has not issued a Scheduling Order authorizing discovery. Plaintiff can renew his request for discovery in the event the Court issues a Scheduling Order. Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying without prejudice #52 Motion for All Naphcare Incorporated Contracts. The Court has not issued a Scheduling Order authorizing discovery. Plaintiff can renew his request for discovery in the event the Court issues a Scheduling Order. Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 28, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for all Naphcare Incorporated Contracts by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (jwr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for all County Podiatry Assoc Contracts by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (jwr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Service to Owners of County Podiatry Associates by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (jwr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 49 Second MOTION for Service to Defendant Barry Wisler by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
October 22, 2020 Filing 48 PROCESS RECEIPT and Return from U.S. Marshal Service for BARRY M WISLER returned unexecuted (meh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN SANER on behalf of KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD (SANER, KATELYN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 46 USM-285 FORM re #41 Waiver of Service Executed (jwr)
October 1, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA per ECF Order #45: Answer due by 11/12/2020. (meh)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to November 12, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 29, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Responses due by 10/20/2020. (SANER, KATELYN)
September 25, 2020 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (meh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER with new service address for Barry Wisler by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS. (meh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 42 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to BARRY WISLER, DPM (meh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed for KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD waiver sent on 8/14/2020; Answer due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Service for Vicente Elias, #2 Service for Carl Sceusa, #3 Service for Pradeep Patel, #4 Service for Nicoletta Turner-Foster, #5 Service for FNU Haczynski, #6 Service for FNU Kodger, #7 Service for Kevin Cassano)(meh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN SANER on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (SANER, KATELYN)
August 25, 2020 Filing 39 Certified Mail Service Returned by Attorney General on 8/20/2020 as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (meh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (certified mail receipt) as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 8/17/2020. Answer due by 10/16/2020. (mlm)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Overruling #33 Objection. The Order denying appointment of counsel is neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
August 13, 2020 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (jwr)
August 13, 2020 Summons completed and mailed via certified mail return receipt along with a copy of the Complaint to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. A PDF DOCUMENT IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. (jwr)
August 13, 2020 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Attorney General)(jwr)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The Clerk will prepare the required summons(es) for service by certified mail on the USA. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re #33 OBJECTION to 30 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
August 11, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Address for Service of Defendants (Attachments: #1 7/31/20 Order for Service, #2 Envelope)(meh)
August 10, 2020 Filing 33 OBJECTION to 30 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, filed by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS. Responses due by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 7/31/20 Order Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel)(meh)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The plaintiff is directed to provide the full name(s) and address(es) for the defendant(s). After the plaintiff has done so, the Clerk is directed to prepare the necessary documents for service by the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal may attempt service by waivers in the first instance. If no waiver(s) is/are timely returned, the Clerk is directed to prepare summons(es) for service in hand by the U.S. Marshal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
July 31, 2020 Reset Deadlines per ECF Order #28: (Service of Process Deadline 9/15/2020) (meh)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Appoint Counsel. While Plaintiff's request is somewhat difficult to discern, to the extent Plaintiff seeks the appointment of counsel, at this stage of the proceedings and on this record, the Court finds no reason to reconsider its order denying Plaintiff's prior motion to appoint counsel. (Order, ECF No. 4.) Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #26 Motion for Service. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Extend Time to Complete and File Proof of Service. Time is extended to September 15, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 29, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS Responses due by 8/19/2020. (meh)
July 29, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS Responses due by 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Financial)(meh)
July 29, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Extend Time by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS Responses due by 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attempts, #2 Envelope)(meh)
June 16, 2020 Reset Deadlines per ECF Order #24 : (Service of Process Deadline 7/31/2020) (meh)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend Time to Complete and File Proof of Service. Time is extended to July 31, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 15, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (Attachments: #1 Document in support, #2 Envelope)(jwr)
April 15, 2020 Reset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Extend Time to Complete and File Proof of Service per Order #22: (Service of Process Deadline 6/30/2020) (meh)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part #21 Motion to Extend Time to Complete and File Proof of Service. Time is extended to June 30, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 15, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Extend Time for Service by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (Attachments: #1 Connecting Page, #2 Envelope)(meh)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD, BARRY WISLER, DPM. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons to FNU Kodger, #2 Summons to Carl Sceusa, #3 Summons to Barry Wisler, #4 Summons to FNU Haczynski, #5 Summons to Kevin Cassano, #6 Summons to Nicoletta Turner-Foster, #7 Summons to Pradeep Patel, #8 Summons to Vincente Elias)(meh)
March 22, 2020 Opinion or Order **ENTERED IN ERROR**Set Deadlines/Hearings : (Service of Process Deadline 4/23/2020) Per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020. (meh) Modified on 3/24/2020 (meh).
March 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings : (Service of Process Deadline 4/17/2020) Per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020. (meh)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court discerns no reason to reconsider its order denying Plaintiff's prior motion to appoint counsel.(Order, ECF No. 4.) Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: service. (jwr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
March 3, 2020 Reset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Extend Time : (Service of Process Deadline 3/24/2020) (meh)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER terminating #12 Order to Show Cause By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Time to Complete and File Proof of Service. Time is extended to March 24, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 Letter MOTION to Extend Time by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS Responses due by 3/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt/Info, #2 Envelope)(meh)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of sending Certified Mail Service on 02/14/2020 as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(meh)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/4/2020. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
January 27, 2020 Reset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Extend Time :(Service of Process Deadline 2/14/2020) (meh)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to Complete and File Proof of Service. Time is extended to February 14, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 Letter MOTION to Extend Time by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (jwr)
November 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Extend Time : (Service of Process Deadline 1/24/2020) (jwr)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Service and File Return of Service. Time is extended to January 24, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time 30-60 days to seek representation by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (jwr)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER regarding service from Clerk's Office. (jwr)
November 4, 2019 Filing Fee Received from JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS: Amount Paid: 350.00. Receipt Number: 120000033. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: Filing fee. Date Paid: 11/4/2019 (jwr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER re: Filing fee by JOSEPH BELSKIS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Filing Fee or Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 11/15/2019. (MFS)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE to pay filing fee or file application to proceed in forma pauperis by 11/15/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS (bfa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEVIN CASSANO, VICENTE ELIAS, NP, FNU HACZYNSKI, FNU KODGER, MD, DAVID ORTIZ, PRADEEP PATEL, MD, CARL SCEUSA, MD, NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARRY WISLER, DPM with Jury Demand, filed by JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS. (Service of Process Deadline 1/21/2020) (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 claim for damage)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELSKIS v. ORTIZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN CASSANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL SCEUSA, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLETTA TURNER-FOSTER, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRADEEP PATEL, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICENTE ELIAS, NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY WISLER, DPM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU KODGER, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU HACZYNSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH EDWARD BOVIN BELSKIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?