RIEGER v. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JENI RIEGER, CARRIE VASSEL, CLYDIENE FRANCIS, KAREN BURNAUGH, GRANT BRADLEY, JODIE CHAPMAN, TOM GARDEN, GUNNEL LOWEGARD, PETER LOWEGARD, ANGELI GOZON, ALOHA DAVIS and ADA GOZON
Defendant: VOLKSWAGEN AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. d/b/a Audi of America, Inc., AUDI AG and VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. a New Jersey corporation doing business as AUDI OF AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10546
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (RAMSEY, HOMER)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Audi AG and Volkswagen AG Without Prejudice by GRANT BRADLEY, KAREN BURNAUGH, JODIE CHAPMAN, ALOHA DAVIS, CLYDIENE FRANCIS, TOM GARDEN, ADA GOZON, ANGELI GOZON, GUNNEL LOWEGARD, PETER LOWEGARD, JENI RIEGER, CARRIE VASSEL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PAUL, RUSSELL)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Reply Filing Deadline for Motion to Dismiss. Defendant VWGoA will file its reply in further support of its Motion to Dismiss by 2/11/2022. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/1/2022. (dmr)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING REPLY FILING DEADLINE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by GRANT BRADLEY, KAREN BURNAUGH, JODIE CHAPMAN, ALOHA DAVIS, CLYDIENE FRANCIS, TOM GARDEN, ADA GOZON, ANGELI GOZON, GUNNEL LOWEGARD, PETER LOWEGARD, JENI RIEGER, CARRIE VASSEL re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (PAUL, RUSSELL)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 1/3/2022 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Frank Pritzl, #3 Exhibit A - 2012 Warranty & Maintenance, #4 Exhibit B - 2013 Warranty & Maintenance, #5 Exhibit C - 2014 Warranty & Maintenance, #6 Exhibit D - 2015 Warranty & Maintenance, #7 Exhibit E - 2017 Warranty & Maintenance, #8 Exhibit F - Lowegard Purchase Agreement (redacted), #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(RAMSEY, HOMER)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATED ORDER expanding the page limitations for briefings of motion to dismiss consolidated class action complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/29/2021. (rtm, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXPANDING PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR BRIEFINGS OF MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER adjusting the briefing schedule for the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/9/2021. (rtm, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER ADJUSTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, LAURA E. GOOLSBY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (rtm, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Laura E. Goolsby to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12913459.) (Park, Amey)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting #40 Motion for Laura E. Goolsby, Esquire, Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 10/20/2021. (rtm, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT : Consolidated Class Action Complaint against GUNNEL LOWEGARD, ALOHA DAVIS, GRANT BRADLEY, TOM GARDEN, JENI RIEGER, KAREN BURNAUGH, PETER LOWEGARD, ANGELI GOZON, JODIE CHAPMAN, CLYDIENE FRANCIS, CARRIE VASSEL, ADA GOZON, filed by GUNNEL LOWEGARD, ALOHA DAVIS, GRANT BRADLEY, TOM GARDEN, JENI RIEGER, KAREN BURNAUGH, PETER LOWEGARD, ANGELI GOZON, JODIE CHAPMAN, CLYDIENE FRANCIS, CARRIE VASSEL, ADA GOZON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(PAUL, RUSSELL)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED ORDER Granting leave to file a consolidated class action complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/7/2021. (rtm, )
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and Order Granting Leave to File Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Setting Response Time for Defendant VGoA, Inc. and Briefing Schedule by All Plaintiffs. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting #38 Motion to Consolidate Cases; ORDERED that scheduling and filing deadlines are vacated; DIRECTING Plaintiff to file a consolidated class action complaint by 10/12/2021, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/29/2021. (rtm, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Extending the deadline to respond to the complaint to 14 days after the Courts ruling of the consent motion to consolidate, for Defendant Volkswagen Group of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 9/17/2021. (rtm, )
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laura E. Goolsby. Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laura E. Goolsby by GRANT BRADLEY, KAREN BURNAUGH, JODIE CHAPMAN, ALOHA DAVIS, CLYDIENE FRANCIS, TOM GARDEN, ADA GOZON, ANGELI GOZON, GUNNEL LOWEGARD, PETER LOWEGARD, JENI RIEGER, CARRIE VASSEL. (Park, Amey)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #38 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Letter from Homer B. Ramsey, Esq. jointly requesting extension of time to respond to Complaint and all filing deadlines re #38 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (RAMSEY, HOMER)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Homer B. Ramsey, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Service)(RAMSEY, HOMER)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by C. MICHAEL ROWAN, JR on behalf of VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (ROWAN, C.)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECONDED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN AG, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., filed by JENI RIEGER, CARRIE VASSEL, CLYDIENE FRANCIS, KAREN BURNAUGH, GRANT BRADLEY, JODIE CHAPMAN, TOM GARDEN, GUNNEL LOWEGARD, PETER LOWEGARD, ANGELI GOZON, ALOHA DAVIS, ADA GOZON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(PAUL, RUSSELL)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL B. GALLUB, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (rtm, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael B.Gallub to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12640439.) (RAMSEY, HOMER)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #19 Motion for Michael Gallub, Esquire, Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 7/16/2021. (rtm, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER withdrawing attorney Steven R Weinmann from this case, Attorney STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 7/8/2021. (rtm, )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Exhibit to #31 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) DISCLOSURE OF THIRD-PARTY LITIGATION FUNDING by JENI RIEGER. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JENI RIEGER identifying DISCLOSURE OF THIRD-PARTY LITIGATION FUNDING as Corporate Parent.. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by JENI RIEGER of Withdrawal of Steven R. Weinmann (WEINMANN, STEVEN)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Cody Padgett to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12596395.) (Park, Amey)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, ADRIAN KARIMI, TAREK H. ZOHDY and CODY R. PADGETT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (rtm, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #25 Motion for Cody Padgett, Esquire, Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/30/2021. (rtm, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tarek Zohdy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12594193.) (Park, Amey)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adrian Karimi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12594161.) (Park, Amey)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cody R. Padgett by JENI RIEGER. (Park, Amey)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Adrian Karimi, Esquire, Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/30/2021. (rtm, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Tarek Zohdy, Esquire, Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/30/2021. (rtm, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Text Order: The motion for the admission of Cody R. Padgett to practice pro hac vice #5 is denied without prejudice. Counsel shall refile it with an updated affidavit, the Court noting that the current affidavit, while signed by Mr. Padgett, notes that Mr. Weinmann is certifying, and the Court cannot accept the affidavit as drafted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/30/21. (Shaw, A). Modified on 6/30/2021 (rtm, ).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/29/2021. (se, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Michael B. Gallub). Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDERED Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on or before 7/26/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/11/2021. (rtm, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Michael B. Gallub) by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of M. Gallub in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of H. Ramsey in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RAMSEY, HOMER)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by HOMER B. RAMSEY on behalf of VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Setting Response Time for Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by JENI RIEGER. (Park, Amey)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons on Amended Complaint served on Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. d/b/a Audi of America, Inc. on 5/25/201, filed by JENI RIEGER. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN AG, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (rtm, )
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Request for Summons to be Issued by JENI RIEGER as to AUDI AG. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request for Summons to be Issued by JENI RIEGER as to VOLKSWAGEN AG. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Request for Summons to be Issued by JENI RIEGER as to VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JENI RIEGER.(PAUL, RUSSELL)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE LESSER on behalf of JENI RIEGER (LESSER, NATALIE)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL GERTNER on behalf of JENI RIEGER (GERTNER, ABIGAIL)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff has fifteen days to amend her complaint to properly comply with 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/4/2021. (rtm, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tarek H. Zohdy, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cody R. Padgett, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adrian Karimi. Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adrian Karimi by JENI RIEGER. (Park, Amey)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN on behalf of JENI RIEGER (WEINMANN, STEVEN)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cody R. Padgett by JENI RIEGER. (Park, Amey)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tarek H. Zohdy by JENI RIEGER. (Park, Amey)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN AG, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/3/2021. (pr, )
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (mmb, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amey J. Park on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Park, Amey)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. d/b/a Audi of America, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12426752) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JENI RIEGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(PAUL, RUSSELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIEGER v. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLKSWAGEN AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. d/b/a Audi of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUDI AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. a New Jersey corporation doing business as AUDI OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: HOMER B. RAMSEY
Represented By: C. MICHAEL ROWAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENI RIEGER
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Represented By: STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN
Represented By: NATALIE LESSER
Represented By: ABIGAIL GERTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE VASSEL
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLYDIENE FRANCIS
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN BURNAUGH
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANT BRADLEY
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODIE CHAPMAN
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM GARDEN
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUNNEL LOWEGARD
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER LOWEGARD
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELI GOZON
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALOHA DAVIS
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA GOZON
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: RUSSELL D. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?