PELLOT v. GGB LLC
Plaintiff: JOSE PELLOT
Defendant: GGB, LLC, A DIVISION OF ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC. and GGB LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv10828
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition filed by GGB LLC re #18 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(SMITH, RALPH)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by GGB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, RALPH)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter from RALPH R. SMITH, 3RD, ESQ. REQUESTING AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF NOM TO REMAND TO 07/20/2021. (SMITH, RALPH)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 6/16/2021. (dmr)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Remand by JOSE PELLOT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(KOBER, PETER)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 11/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/9/2021. (dmr)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GGB LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/2/2021. (dmr)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/8/2021 by telephone. Scheduling Order to be entered (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (mb,
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT, GGB, LLC.. (SMITH, RALPH)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard docket entry #14 . The Letter was resubmitted correctly as docket entry #15 . This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from RALPH R. SMITH, 3RD, ESQ. TO HON. JOSEPH H. RODRIGUEZ REQUESTING THE MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT REMAIN ALIVE AND NOT BE DISMISSED. (SMITH, RALPH)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by GGB LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE RODRIGUEZ REQUESTING THAT THIS MOTION REMAIN ALIVE AND SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED (SMITH, RALPH)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint Discovery Plan by GGB LLC.(SMITH, RALPH)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER : The Court having received and reviewed the June 3, 2021 letter [ECF No. 8] submitted by Ralph R. Smith, III, Esquire, counsel for Defendant, seeking to adjourn the initial conference scheduled for June 6, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. pending disposition of Defendants motion to dismiss; it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants request is DENIED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/4/21. (mb, )
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (KOBER, PETER)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GGB LLC, filed by JOSE PELLOT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(KOBER, PETER)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Plaintiff's attorney. (KOBER, PETER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from RALPH R. SMITH, 3RD, ESQ. TO HON. SHARON A. KING USMJ REQUESTING ADJOURNMENT OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/06/2021. (SMITH, RALPH)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by JOSE PELLOT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (KOBER, PETER)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by GGB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certification of Ralph R. Smith, 3rd, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, RALPH)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 6/21/2021 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GGB LLC identifying ENPRO HOLDINGS as Corporate Parent.. (SMITH, RALPH)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 6/8/21 at 10:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall submitted via email to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/7/21. (mb, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 6/8/2021 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/6/2021. (pr, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to DEFENDANT, GGB, LLC, A DIVISION OF ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC.. Attorney RALPH R. SMITH, III for GGB, LLC, A DIVISION OF ENPRO INDUSTRIES,PETER M. KOBER for JOSE PELLOT added. (SMITH, RALPH)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GGB, LLC, A DIVISION OF ENPRO INDUSTRIES from SUPERIOR COURT OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, case number BUR-C-24-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12441855), filed by GGB, LLC, A DIVISION OF ENPRO INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, RALPH)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dd, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (pr, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jurisdiction,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #2 submitted by GGB, LLC, A DIVISION OF ENPRO INDUSTRIES on 05/06/2021 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 05/27/2021. (pr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PELLOT v. GGB LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGB, LLC, A DIVISION OF ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: RALPH R. SMITH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGB LLC
Represented By: RALPH R. SMITH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE PELLOT
Represented By: PETER M. KOBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?