LEBLANC v. JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: CARMELITA LEBLANC
Defendant: JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL and THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC doing business as JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2021cv12735
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from David M. Koller, Esquire. (KOLLER, DAVID)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/29/2021. (se, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
June 21, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences. RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (pr, )
June 21, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
June 18, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (mmb, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12558276) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CARMELITA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KOLLER, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEBLANC v. JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMELITA LEBLANC
Represented By: DAVID MIKEL KOLLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC doing business as JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?