ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC et al v. REPUBLIC FIRST BANK
Plaintiff: ROBERT LASCALA, ARDMORE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC, BEACH HAVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC, BLAZE MANAGEMENT, LLC, HENRY AVE. ASSOCIATES, LLC, SPROUL PARTNERS, LLC, IZRO PARTNERS, LLC, ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC, SPRING GARDEN PARTNERS, LLC and ZESTO ASSOCIATES, LLC
Defendant: REPUBLIC FIRST BANK doing business as REPUBLIC BANK
3Rd Party Plaintiff: REPUBLIC FIRST BANK
3Rd Party Defendant: ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN and UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv13301
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Gloucester County Courthouse 1 North Broad Street Woodbury, NJ 08096 State No: GLO-C-22-00021. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (dmr)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand; This action is remanded to New Jersey State Court, Gloucester County, Law Division. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/12/2021. (dmr)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Letter from Gregory A. Lomax, Esq. re #20 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (LOMAX, GREGORY)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Remand (LOMAX, GREGORY)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT ORDER that Plaintiffs/Counter- Defendants Rowan Blvd. Associates, LLC's, Beach Haven Associates LLC's, Zesto Associates, LLC's, Sproul Partners, LLC's, Spring Garden Partners, LLC's, Izro Partners, LLC's, Henry Ave Associates, LLC's, Ardmore One Management, LLC's, Blaze Management, LLC's, and Mr. Robert LaScala's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Republic First Bank D/B/A Republic Bank's Interpleader Counterclaim (Dkt. No. 3) is extended through and including the 20th day following this Court's entry of an order deciding LaScala's pending Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/6/2021. (tf, )
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Proposed Order by All Plaintiffs re #3 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. (LOMAX, GREGORY)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/3/2021. By consent of the parties, discovery is stayed pending resolution of the Motion to Remand. Order to be entered. (Electronic Court Recording) (tf, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/3/2021. (slc)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, discovery shall be, and is hereby, stayed pending further Order of the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/3/2021. (slc)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by NEIL COLEMAN SCHUR on behalf of REPUBLIC FIRST BANK (SCHUR, NEIL)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by REPUBLIC FIRST BANK re #8 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 8/3/2021 at 11:00 A.M. shall be, and is hereby, CONVERTED to a telephonic status conference. The parties shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/27/2021. (slc)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from David S. Hollander, Esq. re #10 Letter. (HOLLANDER, DAVID)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter from Gregory A. Lomax, Esq.. (LOMAX, GREGORY)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #8 within 10 days of today. So Ordered by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 07/20/2021. (mlm)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order Order, #9 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LOMAX, GREGORY)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REPUBLIC FIRST BANK identifying Republic Bancorp Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 8/3/2021 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/12/2021. (tf, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 BRIEF of Republic First Bank in response to Plaintiffs' Order to Show Cause (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #1 Notice of Removal Certification of Matthew Lair in response to Plaintiffs' Order to Show Cause by REPUBLIC FIRST BANK. (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by REPUBLIC FIRST BANK.(MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by REPUBLIC FIRST BANK. (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REPUBLIC FIRST BANK from Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County, case number GLO-C-22-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12601969), filed by REPUBLIC FIRST BANK.(MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dd, )
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb, )
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (alb, )
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC et al v. REPUBLIC FIRST BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LASCALA
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARDMORE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEACH HAVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAZE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY AVE. ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPROUL PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IZRO PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRING GARDEN PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZESTO ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLIC FIRST BANK doing business as REPUBLIC BANK
Represented By: BRADLEY L. MITCHELL
Represented By: NEIL COLEMAN SCHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: REPUBLIC FIRST BANK
Represented By: BRADLEY L. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?