SOFTLY v. AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: all others similarly situated and George Softly
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 and American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv13314
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Reopen Case . Motion set for 9/20/2021 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Reopen Case by GEORGE SOFTLY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Brief, #4 Certification of Paul DePetris, #5 Certification of Emma Robison, #6 Certification of Cathy Smith, #7 Certification of Lewis Adler)(ADLER, LEWIS)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from Lewis G. Adler re #7 Letter. (ADLER, LEWIS)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by LEWIS G. ADLER on behalf of GEORGE SOFTLY (ADLER, LEWIS)
August 12, 2021 ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (ar1, )
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER On August 4, 2021, the Court directed Plaintiff to show cause on or before August, 9, 2021, why he failed to respond to Defendant's July 23, 2021, letter. It appearing that Plaintiff failed to respond to that order under pain of dismissal, the Clerk of Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this matter. In the event that Plaintiff seeks to prosecute this matter, he shall first show cause in writing why he failed to abide by this Courts August 4, 2021 Order. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/11/2021. (Costigan, Roberta)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Douglas H. Amster re 13 Order,,,. (AMSTER, DOUGLAS)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER. This matter comes before the Court upon the pre-motion conference letter filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. [Docket No.7] and Plaintiffs failure to comply with the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures. Specifically, Plaintiff has failed to address Defendant's letter within five (5) business days as required by Rule I.A of this Court's Individual Rules and Procedures. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause before this Court within three (3) business days why he has failed to timely respond AND why the relief Defendant seeks in its pre-motion letter should not be granted. If no response is filed, the Court will likely dismiss this matter for failure to prosecute, subject to re-opening only upon good cause shown. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/4/21. (ar1, )
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated August 3, 2021 from Douglas H. Amster, Esquire, counsel for defendant, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the telephone Initial Conference previously set for September 2, 2021, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The NEW date and time of the telephone Initial Conference is September 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. All counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 1488577# to connect to the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/4/21. (nar)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Douglas H. Amster. (AMSTER, DOUGLAS)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Kizirian, Esq., and Zourik Zarifian, Esq. by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of EK, #2 Affidavit of EK, #3 Affidavit in Support of ZZ, #4 Affidavit of ZZ, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(AMSTER, DOUGLAS)
July 28, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Kizirian, Esq., and Zourik Zarifian, Esq.. Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Zourik Zarifian, Esq, for by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(AMSTER, DOUGLAS)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Eric Kizirian, Esq. for by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(AMSTER, DOUGLAS)
July 27, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Applications for pro hac vice #8 , #9 filed by DOUGLAS AMSTER on 7/27/2021 were submitted incorrectly. PLEASE RESUBMIT as motions along with the appropriate supporting motion docs USING event MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE found under MOTIONS. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Honda's Pre-Motion Letter to Judge Bumb re FAC. (AMSTER, DOUGLAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ELYSE TORMEY on behalf of AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (TORMEY, ELYSE)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS HARRY AMSTER on behalf of AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (AMSTER, DOUGLAS)
July 7, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/23/2021. (rss, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant AHM to July 23, 2021.. (KASKIW, GENE)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. identifying Honda Motor Co., Ltd., a publicly-held company in Japan as Corporate Parent.. (KASKIW, GENE)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/2/2021 02:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/6/2021. (alb, )
July 6, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb, )
July 6, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb, )
July 6, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (alb, )
July 2, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. from GEORGE SOFTLY, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, PLAINTIFFS1, V. AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. AND JOHN DOES 1-10, DEFENDANTS, case number BUR-L-1592-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12602839), filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(KASKIW, GENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOFTLY v. AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: GENE KYLE KASKIW
Represented By: ELYSE TORMEY
Represented By: DOUGLAS HARRY AMSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Softly
Represented By: LEE M. PERLMAN
Represented By: LEWIS G. ADLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?