THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY v. C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Plaintiff: THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY, A/S/O OF RPC AND TOWN CENTER AT SHORT HILL CHERRY HILL I, LLC and PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR and C.J. WATSON, INC. doing business as C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Case Number: 1:2021cv14486
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.J. WATSON, INC.. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Initial Conference set for 11/18/2021 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/21/2021. (rtm, )
September 21, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (rtm, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by C.J. WATSON, INC..(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
August 23, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmw)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Judge Noel L. Hillman, Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/18/21. (dd, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY. C.J. WATSON, INC. waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (FIELDS, JIM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Certification of JOINT CERTIFICATION OF CITIZENSHIP OF THE PARTIES IN DIVERSITY CASES on behalf of PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY Re Order re Diversity of Citizenship (Hillman),,. (FIELDS, JIM)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR, filed by PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY.(FIELDS, JIM)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days to amend its Complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/3/2021. (rss, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
August 3, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dd, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/3/2021. (alb, )
August 3, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jurisdiction, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb, )
August 2, 2021 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dd, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY, A/S/O OF RPC AND TOWN CENTER AT SHORT HILL CHERRY HILL I, LLC identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FIELDS, JIM)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12681116) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY, A/S/O OF RPC AND TOWN CENTER AT SHORT HILL CHERRY HILL I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FIELDS, JIM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY v. C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY, A/S/O OF RPC AND TOWN CENTER AT SHORT HILL CHERRY HILL I, LLC
Represented By: JIM H. FIELDS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JIM H. FIELDS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.J. WATSON, INC. doing business as C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Represented By: GAETANO MERCOGLIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?