COHAN et al v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: JOHN MICHAEL COHAN and CAPITULUM, LLC.
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY, BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, DEMICHELE AND DEMICHELE, OFFICER ARTHUR KNAPP, BOROUGH OF BERLIN, SERGEANT WAECHTLER and DETECTIVE HERON
Case Number: 1:2021cv15452
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/28/2021. Initial Scheduling Conference to reconvene. Order setting new date to be entered. (Electronic Court Recording) (tf, )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court shall reconvene the telephonic initial scheduling conference on 11/15/2021 at 12:00 Noon. The parties shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/28/2021. (slc, n.m.)
September 22, 2021 NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 9/28/2021 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 9/8/2021. (sb, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, BOROUGH OF BERLIN, HERON, ARTHUR KNAPP, WAECHTLER. (WOLK, CHRISTOPHER)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against ALL SUBSEQUENT ANSWERING DEFENDANTS by BOROUGH OF BERLIN, BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, ARTHUR KNAPP, HERON, WAECHTLER.(WOLK, CHRISTOPHER)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN MICHAEL COHAN. (Clerk's Note: Defendant not named on Summons) (tf, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 9/28/2021 at 11:00 A.M. shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. The parties shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/9/2021. (slc, n.m.)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference set for 9/28/2021 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/8/2021. (tf, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , and Cross-Claims, by BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT.(WOLK, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 9/7/2021 (tf, ).
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, ARTHUR KNAPP, BOROUGH OF BERLIN, WAECHTLER, HERON, filed by JOHN MICHAEL COHAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(tf, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, DEMICHELE AND DEMICHELE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, n.m).
August 23, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number CAM013119 (dd, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (dmw)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (dmw) n.m.
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint Received. NO IFP/FILING FEE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope, #3 Filing Fee returned letter)(dmw)
August 17, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that although an individual is entitled to proceed pro se, a corporation must be represented by counsel. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COHAN et al v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MICHAEL COHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPITULUM, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. WOLK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMICHELE AND DEMICHELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ARTHUR KNAPP
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. WOLK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF BERLIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. WOLK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT WAECHTLER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. WOLK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE HERON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. WOLK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?