SAGER et al v. KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GLENN SAGER and THOMAS HARRIES
Defendant: KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY, GENERAL MOTORS HOLDINGS LLC, GENERAL MOTORS LLC and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv15867
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric K. Gerard to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12915204.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 21, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Melissa L. Troutner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12915175.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 21, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MELISSA L. TROUTNER and ERIC K. GERARD, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motions, ECF. Nos. 10, 11 and 12 shall file an amended certified statement of the applicant "certifying that no disciplinary proceedings are pending against the attorney in any jurisdiction and no discipline has previously been imposed on the attorney in any jurisdiction" as set forth in L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(1); or in lieu thereof, may attach a certificate of good standing. See https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/local-rules-and-appendices.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 10/20/21. (mb, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa L. Troutner, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 10/19/2021. (dmr)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erik K. Gerard, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 10/19/2021. (dmr)
October 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
October 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by THOMAS HARRIES, GLENN SAGER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caroline F. Bartlett, #2 Certification of Melissa L. Troutner, #3 Certification of Eric K. Gerard, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. MELTZER on behalf of THOMAS HARRIES, GLENN SAGER (MELTZER, JOSEPH)
October 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Mitchell Williams, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by H. Clay Barnett, III, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
October 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Mitchell Williams by THOMAS HARRIES, GLENN SAGER. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Certification of Christopher A. Seeger, #3 Certification James Mitchell Williams, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III by THOMAS HARRIES, GLENN SAGER. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Certification of Christopher A. Seeger, #3 Certification of W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by H. Clay Barnett, III by THOMAS HARRIES, GLENN SAGER. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Certification of Christopher A. Seeger, #3 Certification of H. Clay Barnett, III, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting request to extend the time within which served Defendants have to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 11/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/20/2021. (rtm, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Served Defendants' Time To Respond To Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel. The Court hereby appoints KTMC, Seeger Weiss, and Carella Byrne as Interim Lead Class Counsel to act on behalf of the Plaintiffs, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/13/2021. (dmr)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Robert B. Kugler, USDJ regarding appointment of interim class counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS on behalf of THOMAS HARRIES, GLENN SAGER (AYERS, CHRISTOPHER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of THOMAS HARRIES, GLENN SAGER (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FCA US LLC, GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY, GENERAL MOTORS HOLDINGS LLC, GENERAL MOTORS LLC, KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE F. BARTLETT on behalf of THOMAS HARRIES, GLENN SAGER (BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY, GENERAL MOTORS HOLDINGS LLC, GENERAL MOTORS LLC, KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12739912) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GLENN SAGER, THOMAS HARRIES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 23, 2021 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAGER et al v. KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN SAGER
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: JOSEPH H. MELTZER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS HARRIES
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: JOSEPH H. MELTZER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?