ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC et al v. REPUBLIC FIRST BANK et al
Plaintiff: ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC, BEACH HAVEN ASSOCIATES LLC, ZESTO ASSOCIATES, LLC, SPROUL PARTNERS, LLC, SPRING GARDEN PARTNERS, LLC, IZRO PARTNERS, LLC, HENRY AVE ASSOCIATES, LLC, ARDMORE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC, BLAZE MANAGEMENT, LLC and ROBERT LASCALA
Defendant: REPUBLIC FIRST BANK and REPUBLIC FIRST BANK doing business as REPUBLIC BANK
3Rd Party Defendant: UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION and ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv17278
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Bradley L. Mitchell re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Interpleader Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Republic's Third-Party Complaint. (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER scheduling Telephone Conference for 11/23/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/9/2021. (dmr)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2021. Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on the record. Order to be entered. (Electronic Court Recording) (dmr)
November 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Republic's Third-Party Complaint. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Republic's Third-Party Complaint by ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Bradley L. Mitchell re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Interpleader Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint. (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, the telephonic initial scheduling conference on 10/26/2021 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED. The Court has RESCHEDULED the conference for 11/9/2021 at 11:00 A.M. Counsel shall utilize the same dial-in instructions as previously provided by the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/15/2021. (slc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from U.S. Attorney's Office Requesting Adjournment of October 26 Initial Conference re #3 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (BASIAK, JOHN)
October 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Interpleader Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint. Motion set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Interpleader Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LOMAX, GREGORY)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 10/26/2021 at 11:30 A.M. shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/13/2021. (slc)
September 28, 2021 Clerk's Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order,, submitted by IZRO PARTNERS, LLC, ZESTO ASSOCIATES, LLC, HENRY AVE ASSOCIATES, LLC, BLAZE MANAGEMENT, LLC, BEACH HAVEN ASSOCIATES LLC, ARDMORE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC, ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC, SPROUL PARTNERS, LLC, ROBERT LASCALA, SPRING GARDEN PARTNERS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/14/2021. (dmr)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for ARDMORE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for BEACH HAVEN ASSOCIATES LLC,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for BLAZE MANAGEMENT, LLC,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for HENRY AVE ASSOCIATES, LLC,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for IZRO PARTNERS, LLC,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for ROBERT LASCALA,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for SPRING GARDEN PARTNERS, LLC,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for SPROUL PARTNERS, LLC,GREGORY ALAN LOMAX for ZESTO ASSOCIATES, LLC added. (LOMAX, GREGORY)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID S. HOLLANDER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HOLLANDER, DAVID)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 10/26/2021 11:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/22/2021. (alb, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Letter from Gregory A. Lomax, Esq.. (LOMAX, GREGORY)
September 22, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Nature of Suit . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb, )
September 22, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (alb, )
September 21, 2021 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Chancery Division, General Equity Part, case number GLO-C-22-21., filed by ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Verified Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Order), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Order to Show Cause), #5 Exhibit 5 (Notice of Notice of Removal), #6 Exhibit 6 (State Court Scheduling Order), #7 Exhibit 7 (State Court Scheduling Order), #8 Exhibit 8 (Republic's Opposition to OTSC), #9 Exhibit 9 (Republic's Answer and Third-Party Complaint), #10 Exhibit 10 (Consent Scheduling Order), #11 Exhibit 11 (Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of OTSC), #12 Exhibit 12 (Letter to State Court), #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC et al v. REPUBLIC FIRST BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROWAN BLVD. ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEACH HAVEN ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZESTO ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPROUL PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRING GARDEN PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IZRO PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY AVE ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARDMORE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAZE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LASCALA
Represented By: DAVID S. HOLLANDER
Represented By: GREGORY ALAN LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLIC FIRST BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLIC FIRST BANK doing business as REPUBLIC BANK
Represented By: BRADLEY L. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN
Represented By: JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?