THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc. v. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN and JEANNETTE LARKINS
Case Number: 1:2021cv17672
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendants' request for a 30 day extension of time to respond to the Complaint; the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to 12/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 11/9/2021. (tf, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Laurie Fichera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FICHERA, LAURIE)
November 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. (dd, )
October 26, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JEANNETTE LARKINS, ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/10/2021. (tf, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (FICHERA, LAURIE)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURIE LEE FICHERA on behalf of All Defendants (FICHERA, LAURIE)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.. Amendment to #6 Summons Returned Executed . (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.. JEANNETTE LARKINS served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.. ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN, JEANNETTE LARKINS, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb)
October 5, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: In the future please make sure to add all information as represented in the caption; when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Complaint Ex. 1. (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
September 28, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Exhibit #1 to document #1 Complaint submitted by Jeffrey Wasserman on 9/27/21 is unreadable. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT. (dd, )
September 27, 2021 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Complaint CIVIL COVER SHEET FORM JS 44. (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12840148), filed by THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc. v. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE INNISFREE FOUNDATION, Inc.
Represented By: JEFFREY IAN WASSERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: LAURIE LEE FICHERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN
Represented By: LAURIE LEE FICHERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNETTE LARKINS
Represented By: LAURIE LEE FICHERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?