LOVELAND v. FARMERS GROUP INC. et al
Plaintiff: JR. BRADLEY D. LOVELAND and BRADLEY D LOVELAND, JR
Defendant: FARMERS GROUP INC., METLIFE INC., METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY and METROPOLITAIN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv17752
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
2 Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/7/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 12/31/2021. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 5/31/2022. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in August 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/19/2021. (tf, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Discovery Plan by BRADLEY D LOVELAND, JR.(ELLERY, MICHAEL)
November 19, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 11/19/2021. (sb, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Discovery Plan by BRADLEY D LOVELAND, JR.(ELLERY, MICHAEL)
November 15, 2021 NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 11/19/2021 Scheduling Conference. See Text Order dated 11/1/2021. (sb, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez for all further proceedings. Judge Renee Marie Bumb no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/2/2021. (mmb, )
November 2, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (tf, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: By consent, the initial scheduling conference on 11/23/2021 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 11/19/2021 at 12:00 Noon and shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/1/2021. (slc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Michael E. Ellery, Esq.. (ELLERY, MICHAEL)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 11/23/2021 12:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/1/2021. (tf, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FARMERS GROUP INC., METLIFE INC., METROPOLITAIN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(MURPHY, THOMAS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint by BRADLEY D. LOVELAND. (ELLERY, MICHAEL)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FARMERS GROUP INC., METLIFE INC., METROPOLITAIN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12845561) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRADLEY D LOVELAND.(ELLERY, MICHAEL)
September 29, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dd, )
September 29, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
September 29, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb)
September 29, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOVELAND v. FARMERS GROUP INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JR. BRADLEY D. LOVELAND
Represented By: MICHAEL E. ELLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY D LOVELAND, JR
Represented By: MICHAEL E. ELLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARMERS GROUP INC.
Represented By: THOMAS J. MURPHY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METLIFE INC.
Represented By: THOMAS J. MURPHY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS J. MURPHY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAIN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS J. MURPHY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?