F.V. & M.V. v. CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff: F.V. & M.V., INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF B.V. and F.V. & M.V.
Defendant: CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv18096
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Sharon A King
2 Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim (EPSTEIN, JAMIE)
November 29, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 1/3/2022 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order, #3 Affidavit Affidavit, #4 Brief Brief, #5 Certificate of mailing, #6 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(HARRISON, ERIC)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Judge Noel L. Hillman no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/17/2021. (dmw)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference scheduled for December 9, 2021 at 3:00 pm is ADJOURNED to January 5, 2022 at 2:00 pm VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be submitted via email to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 11/15/21. (mb, )
November 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. (dd, )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 12/9/2021 03:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/14/2021. (rtm, )
October 14, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (rtm, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from plaintiffs re #4 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #4 )(EPSTEIN, JAMIE)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Eric Harrison to NJ Department of Education re administrative record to be sent to Judge Hillman's chambers. (HARRISON, ERIC)
October 11, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 June 17, 2021 Final Decision)(HARRISON, ERIC)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. (HARRISON, ERIC)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION from CAMDEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number CAM-L-2823-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12867207), filed by CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Verified Complaint, #2 First Amended Verified Complaint, #3 Cover letter)(HARRISON, ERIC)
October 5, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dd, )
October 5, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Other: ORIGIN- 2 Removal from State Court . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb)
October 5, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences KMW. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb)
October 5, 2021 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F.V. & M.V. v. CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.V. & M.V., INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF B.V.
Represented By: JAMIE MARK EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.V. & M.V.
Represented By: JAMIE MARK EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERRY HILL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: ERIC L. HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?