ZUFFA, LLC v. BALON et al
Plaintiff: ZUFFA, LLC doing business as ULTIMATE FIGHTING CHAMPIONSHIP
Defendant: FRANCIS BALON, DONNA BALON, CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC and CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC doing business as THE COOL CRICKET
Case Number: 1:2021cv20428
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Sharon A King
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ZUFFA, LLC (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
January 20, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
January 11, 2022 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #10 submitted by FRANCIS BALON, DONNA BALON, and CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC on 1/10/2022 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/27/2022. (dmr)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DONNA BALON, FRANCIS BALON, CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SELVERS, ROBERT)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT L. SELVERS on behalf of DONNA BALON, FRANCIS BALON, CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC (SELVERS, ROBERT)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZUFFA, LLC. FRANCIS BALON served on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZUFFA, LLC. DONNA BALON served on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZUFFA, LLC. CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC served on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DONNA BALON, FRANCIS BALON, CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (alb)
December 10, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by ZUFFA, LLC REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING COPYRIGHT (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZUFFA, LLC. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DONNA BALON, FRANCIS BALON, CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13033744), filed by ZUFFA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons as to deft Francis Balon, #4 Summons Summons as to deft Donna Balon, #5 Summons Summons as to deft Cricket Associates LLC)(LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
December 9, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb)
December 9, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZUFFA, LLC v. BALON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZUFFA, LLC doing business as ULTIMATE FIGHTING CHAMPIONSHIP
Represented By: WAYNE D. LONSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS BALON
Represented By: ROBERT L. SELVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA BALON
Represented By: ROBERT L. SELVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRICKET ASSOCIATES LLC doing business as THE COOL CRICKET
Represented By: ROBERT L. SELVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?