PETRI et al v. DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: KRISTIN PETRI and SHERDON GREEN
Defendant: DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY and PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv20510
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Christine P O'Hearn
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Pascal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio no longer assigned to case. (DS, )
June 2, 2022 Filing 42 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel S. Sanders III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
June 2, 2022 Filing 41 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James Matthew Brigman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
June 2, 2022 Filing 40 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Julia C. Barrett to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
June 2, 2022 Filing 39 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Zachary A. McEntyre to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
June 2, 2022 Filing 38 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey S. Cashdan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
June 2, 2022 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JEFFREY S. CASHDAN, ZACHARY A. MCENTYRE, JULIA C. BARRETT, JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN and DANIEL S. SANDERS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (alb)
May 5, 2022 Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY re #32 MOTION to Dismiss (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of #32 MOTION to Dismiss by 5/5/2022. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 4/21/2022. (dmr)
April 20, 2022 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss - Consent Motion to Extend Defendants' time to file reply regarding its motion to dismiss until May 5, 2022 by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
April 18, 2022 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KRISTIN PETRI re #32 MOTION to Dismiss (EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
April 6, 2022 Filing 33 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew Shamis to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
April 6, 2022 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Andrew Shamis:$ 150, receipt number TRE125753 (jdg, )
April 5, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (alb)
April 4, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support Of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #3 Declaration of Craig Carpenito in Support Of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1 to Carpenito Declaration)(CARPENITO, CRAIG)
March 25, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by RACHEL EDELSBERG on 3/24/22 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has paid the application fee. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (amv)
March 24, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew Shamis to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ANDREW SHAMIS, shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/22/2022. (amv)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants shall have through and including 4/4/2022 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/10/2022. (abr, )
March 10, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. Motion set for 4/4/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
March 9, 2022 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CARPENITO, CRAIG)
March 7, 2022 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by KRISTIN PETRI, SHERDON GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Petri Market Valuation, #3 Exhibit C - Green Market Valuation)(EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
February 28, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Shamis by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rachel Dapeer in Support of Application for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Shamis, #2 Certification of Andrew Shamis in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
February 28, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Shamis. Motion set for 4/4/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
February 25, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Fee Received as to Matthew Brigman, Daniel S. Sanders III, Zachary A. McEntyre, Julia C. Barrett, and Jeffrey S. Cashdanshall: $ 750, receipt number TRE125025 (jmh) Modified on 2/28/2022 (tf, ).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey S. Cashdanshall, shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/23/2022. (alb)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to AMY L. JUDKINS, shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/23/2022. (alb)
February 23, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY re #10 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey S. Cashdan (Amended) (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JULIA C. BARRETT, shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/22/2022. (amv)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ZACHARY A. MCENTYRE, shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/22/2022. (amv)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DANIEL S. SANDERS III, shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/22/2022. (amv)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN, shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/22/2022. (amv)
February 22, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julia C. Barrett, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary A. McEntyre. Motion set for 3/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
February 22, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/21/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
February 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 3/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Craig Carpenito, #3 Exhibit 1- True and correct copy of an August 25, 2006 letter from the New Jersey Department of Banking and Insurance, Division of Insurance, #4 Proposed Order)(CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 18, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julia C. Barrett by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary A. McEntyre by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 18, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY re #12 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel S. Sanders III (AMENDED) (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 18, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY re #11 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Matthew Brigman (AMENDED) (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motions [D.I. 10, 11, 12] shall file amended certified statements of the applicants "disclosing each bar in which the applicant is a member in good standing including... the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members of its bar" as set forth in the amendment to L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1) (eff. March 1, 2010); or in lieu thereof, may attach certificates of good standing. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/14/2022. (slc)
February 14, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #10 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey S. Cashdan, #11 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Matthew Brigman, #12 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel S. Sanders III. Motion set for 3/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg, )
February 11, 2022 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel S. Sanders III by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Matthew Brigman by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 11, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey S. Cashdan by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 Certification of Amy L. Judkins on behalf of KRISTIN PETRI Re QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney,,. (EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
February 7, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Amy L. Judkins attached to the Motion for Pro Hac Vice #8 submitted by Rachel Dapeer on 2/3/2022 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the "Certification" event found under Responses and Replies. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amy L. Judkins by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rachel Dapeer in Support of Application for The Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy L. Judkins, #2 Certification of Amy L. Judkins in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
February 3, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amy L. Judkins. Motion set for 3/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants shall have through and including February 21, 2022 to answer or otherwise file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/18/2022. (tf, )
January 18, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond until 2-21-22. Motion set for 2/22/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pr, )
January 17, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond until 2-21-22 by DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CARPENITO, CRAIG)
January 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG CARPENITO on behalf of DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (CARPENITO, CRAIG)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISTIN PETRI. PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISTIN PETRI. DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (EDELSBERG, RACHEL)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv)
December 16, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information; Capitalize Parties . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (amv)
December 16, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, In the future when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (amv)
December 15, 2021 Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-13044581) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kristin Petri, Sherdon Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Petri Market Valuation, #4 Exhibit C - Green Market Valuation)(EDELSBERG, RACHEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETRI et al v. DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTIN PETRI
Represented By: RACHEL NICOLE EDELSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERDON GREEN
Represented By: RACHEL NICOLE EDELSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CRAIG CARPENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CRAIG CARPENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?