TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133 et al v. BROCK INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133 and INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711
Defendant: BROCK INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00724
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711. BROCK INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (FEEHAN, W.)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133. (FEEHAN, W.)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133. (FEEHAN, W.)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to BROCK INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv, )
February 14, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the summons issued #3 filed by the Clerk's office on 2/14/22 was docketed erroneously. Please disregard. (amv)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133 (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROCK INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13179626), filed by TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FEEHAN, W.)
February 10, 2022 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133 et al v. BROCK INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND; VACATION FUND; TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE; LOCAL 133
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROCK INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?