BERMUDEZ v. INTA-ROTO, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ABNER BERMUDEZ
Defendant: INTA-ROTO, INC., SMART MACHINES TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SMART MACHINES, INC., EMERSON ELECTRIC CO., PACKING CORPORATION OF AMERICA, XYZ CORPORATION 1-5, ABC PARTNERSHIP 1-5, JOHN DOE 1-5, SMART MACHINE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., EMERSON DRIVES, EMERSON and JANE DOE 1-5
Case Number: 1:2022cv01606
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to counsel's request, the telephone status conference currently scheduled for July 5, 2022 is hereby moved to July 19, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. The call in information remains 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 5/18/22. (Shaw, A).
May 17, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from Plaintiff's counsel. (SACCHETTA, THOMAS)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the initial status conference currently scheduled for June 1, 2022 is hereby moved to July 5, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. The call in information is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 5/12/22. (Shaw, A).
May 9, 2022 Filing 16 Packaging Corporation of America's ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM for Contribution and Common Law Indemnification against All Defendants by PACKING CORPORATION OF AMERICA.(DONNELLY, FRANCIS)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The initial conference on May 18, 2022 is RESCHEDULED to June 1, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. The call-in number is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 4/22/2022. (rss, )
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 Smart Machine Technologies, Inc. i/p/a Smart Machines, Inc. ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ABC PARTNERSHIP 1-5, EMERSON, EMERSON DRIVES, INTA-ROTO, INC., JANE DOE 1-5, JOHN DOE 1-5, PACKING CORPORATION OF AMERICA, XYZ CORPORATION 1-5 by SMART MACHINE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SMART MACHINES, INC..(CANNING, JAUNICE)
April 22, 2022 Filing 13 Letter from Jaunice M. Canning, Esq.. (CANNING, JAUNICE)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Initial Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 2:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 4/20/2022. (dmr)
April 19, 2022 Filing 11 Certification of joint diversity certification on behalf of EMERSON. (DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
April 19, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against INTA-ROTO, INC., PACKING CORPORATION OF AMERICA by EMERSON.(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 Exhibit to #8 Amended Complaint by ABNER BERMUDEZ. (SACCHETTA, THOMAS)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ABNER BERMUDEZ.(SACCHETTA, THOMAS)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PACKING CORPORATION OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mag)
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Summons to be Issued by ABNER BERMUDEZ as to PACKING CORPORATION OF AMERICA. (SACCHETTA, THOMAS)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SMART MACHINE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SMART MACHINES, INC.. (CANNING, JAUNICE)
March 28, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, and failure to state a claim, and for a more definite statement. Motion set for 4/18/2022 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, and failure to state a claim, and for a more definite statement by EMERSON, EMERSON DRIVES. Responses due by 4/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph DiRienzo in support of motion, #2 Exhibit A to DiRienzo Certification, #3 Exhibit B to DiRienzo Certification, #4 Exhibit C to DiRienzo Certification, #5 Brief in support of motion)(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMERSON, EMERSON DRIVES identifying Emerson Electric Co. as Corporate Parent.. (DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
March 23, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jab,)
March 23, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab,)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/23/2022. (jab,)
March 23, 2022 Notice of Judicial Preferences. KMW #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab,)
March 23, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jab,)
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. from Superior Court of NJ, Law Div., Camden County, case number CAM-L-000458-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13273772), filed by EMERSON ELECTRIC CO..(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
March 22, 2022 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw)
March 22, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERMUDEZ v. INTA-ROTO, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABNER BERMUDEZ
Represented By: THOMAS F. SACCHETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTA-ROTO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART MACHINES TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: JAUNICE M. CANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART MACHINES, INC.
Represented By: JAUNICE M. CANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACKING CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: FRANCIS X. DONNELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATION 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC PARTNERSHIP 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART MACHINE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: JAUNICE M. CANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON DRIVES
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?