M & M TRUCKING GUDULLU, LLC et al v. LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: M & M TRUCKING GUDULLU, LLC and ABDULLAH OKUSAL
Defendant: LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC., GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC, PACCAR INC., GABRIELLI TRUCK SALES, INC., PACCAR, INC. and JOHN DOES, I-V
Case Number: 1:2022cv03593
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Christine P O'Hearn
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GABRIELLI TRUCK SALES, INC., LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC., PACCAR, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LANEY, CLIFFORD)
July 18, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit A)(HISKEY, TIMOTHY)
July 15, 2022 Filing 10 Certification on behalf of PACCAR, INC. Re Order re Diversity of Citizenship,,,. (LALLIS, DANNY)
June 30, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial). Motion set for 8/1/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
June 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by GABRIELLI TRUCK SALES, INC., LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC., PACCAR, INC.. Responses due by 7/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Danny C. Lallis in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Kenworth Limited Warranty, #4 Exhibit B - PACCAR Limited Engine Warranty, #5 Exhibit C - PACCAR Extended Engine Coverages, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(LALLIS, DANNY)
June 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY G. HISKEY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HISKEY, TIMOTHY)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 6/21/2022. (tf, )
June 15, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GABRIELLI TRUCK SALES, INC., LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC., PACCAR, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/29/2022. (mag)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to PACCAR Inc, Liberty Kenworth-Hino Truck Sales, Inc., and Gabrielli Kenworth of NJ, LLC i/p/h/a Gabrielli Truck Sales, Inc... (LALLIS, DANNY)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD MARK LANEY on behalf of GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC, LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC., PACCAR INC. (LANEY, CLIFFORD)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY M. PISCIOTTI on behalf of GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC, LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC., PACCAR INC. (PISCIOTTI, ANTHONY)
June 9, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information,Removal-Other Court Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (bda)
June 8, 2022 Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (bf, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC.. (LALLIS, DANNY)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC. (LALLIS, DANNY)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PACCAR INC.. (LALLIS, DANNY)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC, LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC., PACCAR INC. from Superior Court of Burlington County, case number BUR-L-0778-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13471756), filed by GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC, LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC., PACCAR INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavits of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Liberty Entity Details, #5 Exhibit E - Gabrielli Entity Details, #6 Exhibit F - Limited Warranties, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Service)(LALLIS, DANNY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M & M TRUCKING GUDULLU, LLC et al v. LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M & M TRUCKING GUDULLU, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY G. HISKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABDULLAH OKUSAL
Represented By: TIMOTHY G. HISKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY KENWORTH-HINO TRUCK SALES, INC.
Represented By: DANNY CHARLES LALLIS
Represented By: ANTHONY M. PISCIOTTI
Represented By: CLIFFORD MARK LANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIELLI KENWORTH OF NEW JERSEY LLC
Represented By: DANNY CHARLES LALLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR INC.
Represented By: DANNY CHARLES LALLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIELLI TRUCK SALES, INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY M. PISCIOTTI
Represented By: CLIFFORD MARK LANEY
Represented By: DANNY CHARLES LALLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY M. PISCIOTTI
Represented By: CLIFFORD MARK LANEY
Represented By: DANNY CHARLES LALLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES, I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?