MURPHY-DORSANEO v. JUNG et al
Plaintiff: DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO
Defendant: JIN JUNG, M.D., ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, M.D., LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGINE, RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCITES, LLC., VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON, VIRTUA HEALTH, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC. and Emergency Phyisician Services of New Jersey, PA
Case Number: 1:2022cv05100
Filed: August 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
2 Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 11/22/2022. (alb, )
November 22, 2022 Filing 27 Proposed Order by JIN JUNG, MD, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING, RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A.. (TALVACCHIA, JOHN)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2022. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/31/2023. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in August 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 11/15/2022. (alb, )
November 8, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill: Initial Conference held by phone on 11/8/2022. (rss, )
November 3, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Emergency Phyisician Services of New Jersey, PA.(WANG-DEVENEY, FRANCES)
November 1, 2022 Filing 24 Certification on behalf of ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, MD, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC., Emergency Phyisician Services of New Jersey, PA, JIN JUNG, MD, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING, DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO, RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A., VIRTUA HEALTH, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON, arbtre. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
October 31, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, MD, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC., Emergency Phyisician Services of New Jersey, PA, JIN JUNG, MD, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING, RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A. by VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON, VIRTUA HEALTH.(SLEEPER, CAROLYN)
October 21, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, MD, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC., Emergency Phyisician Services of New Jersey, PA, VIRTUA HEALTH, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON by JIN JUNG, MD, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING, RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A..(TALVACCHIA, JOHN)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER Within five (5) days of this Order, the parties shall file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties as instructed in the Court's August 23, 2022 Text Order. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/18/22. (nar)
October 14, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO.(MIRABELLA, JOHN)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The initial conference is rescheduled for November 8, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. via telephone before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. The call-in number is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 10/12/2022. (rss, )
October 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio no longer assigned to case. (mmb, )
October 6, 2022 Filing 18 Joint Discovery Plan by VIRTUA HEALTH, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON.(SLEEPER, CAROLYN)
October 5, 2022 NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 10/11/2022 Scheduling Conference. See Amended Order dated 9/13/2022 and Text Order dated 9/21/2022. (sb, )
September 30, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT AS TO DEFENDANT ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, M.D. by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
September 30, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT AS TO DEFENDANT JIN JUNG, M.D. by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
September 30, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT AS TO DEFENDANT JIN JUNG, M.D. by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
September 28, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, MD.(BLUMBERG, JAY)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 10/11/2022 at 12:00 Noon shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the Joint Discovery Plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/21/2022. (slc)
September 15, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, MD, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC., JIN JUNG, MD, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING, RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A. by VIRTUA HEALTH, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON.(SLEEPER, CAROLYN)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended Order Initial Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 12:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/13/2022. (alb, ) Modified on 9/14/2022 (jmh).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Initial Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 12:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/13/2022. (alb, ) Modified on 9/14/2022 (jmh).
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 Defendants, Jin Jung, MD, Larchmont Medical Imaging, Radiology Associates of Burlington County, PA ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, MD, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC., VIRTUA HEALTH, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON by RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A., JIN JUNG, MD, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING.(TALVACCHIA, JOHN)
September 8, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Jin Jung, M.D. on 08/25/2022, filed by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
September 8, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Larchmont Medical Imaging on 08/25/2022, filed by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
September 8, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Radiology Associates of Burlington County on 08/25/2022, filed by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Virtua Health on 08/25/2022, filed by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
September 8, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Virtua Memorial Hospital by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MIRABELLA on behalf of DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO (MIRABELLA, JOHN)
August 23, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, MD, EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC., JIN JUNG, MD, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING, RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A., VIRTUA HEALTH, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
August 23, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab)
August 23, 2022 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/23/2022. (jab)
August 23, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jab)
August 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JIN JUNG, ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING, RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC., EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC., VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON, VIRTUA HEALTH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number CNJDC-13637583) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, GREGORY)
August 18, 2022 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURPHY-DORSANEO v. JUNG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESTINY MURPHY-DORSANEO
Represented By: GREGORY A. SMITH
Represented By: JOHN MIRABELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIN JUNG, M.D.
Represented By: JOHN A. TALVACCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANITA BHAMIDIPATI, M.D.
Represented By: JAY J. BLUMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF BURLINGTON COUNTY P.A.
Represented By: JOHN A. TALVACCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH JERSEY, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCITES, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-BURLINGTON
Represented By: CAROLYN R. SLEEPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRTUA HEALTH
Represented By: CAROLYN R. SLEEPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARCHMONT MEDICAL IMAGING
Represented By: JOHN A. TALVACCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Phyisician Services of New Jersey, PA
Represented By: FRANCES WANG-DEVENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?