HIGH POINT PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY v. CHUNG CHENG FAUCET CO., LTD.
Plaintiff: HIGH POINT PREFERRED INSURANCE CO.
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC, Yoddex International, Inc., BANNER INTL., LLC, LOWES, JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC COMPANY 1-10
Cross Defendant: Chung Cheng Faucet Co., Ltd
Case Number: 1:2023cv01334
Filed: March 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - A Stipulation of Dismissal #11 was filed by Michael Riel on 4/13/2023. At the request of Chambers, please submit a proper Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (dmr)
April 13, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Banner International by HIGH POINT PREFERRED INSURANCE CO.. (RIEHL, MICHAEL)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Text Order: Counsel shall submit the Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties (see text order docketed as entry no. 3 ) by no later than April 14, 2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 4/12/23. (Shaw, A)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Text Order: Having conferenced with counsel on April 12, 2023, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the Court will defer entering any scheduling deadlines in order to permit additional time for service on defendants Chung Cheng Faucet Co., Ltd., and Yoddex International, Inc. Counsel shall submit the voluntary stipulation to the Court dismissing defendant Banner, Intl. without prejudice by April 19, 2023. There will be a conference call on May 17, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. The call-in number is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 4/12/23. (Shaw, A)
April 12, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill: Initial Conference held by phone on 4/12/2023. (rss, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 8 Diversity Disclosure Statement by LOWES. (FORRESTER, ROSA)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The call in information for the initial conference scheduled for April 12, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 4/6/23. (Shaw, A)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 4/12/2023 at 9:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 3/16/2023. (dmr)
March 15, 2023 Filing 5 Lowe's Home Centers, LLC ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM against CHUNG CHENG FAUCET CO., LTD, YODDEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. by LOWES.(FORRESTER, ROSA)
March 15, 2023 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by LOWES. (FORRESTER, ROSA)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/10/2023. (ssp, )
March 10, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw, )
March 10, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
March 9, 2023 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw)
March 9, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (FORRESTER, ROSA)
March 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC from Gloucester County Superior Court, case number GLO-L-0050-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14144429), filed by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B- Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Ex. C- Demand for Stmt of Damages, #4 Exhibit Ex. D- Declaration)(FORRESTER, ROSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIGH POINT PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY v. CHUNG CHENG FAUCET CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGH POINT PREFERRED INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: MICHAEL RIEHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: ROSA FORRESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoddex International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANNER INTL., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWES
Represented By: ROSA FORRESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Chung Cheng Faucet Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?