MARCO CAPITAL, INC. et al v. M/V ZHEN ZHU HAI et al
Plaintiff: Marco Capital, Inc. and Mickey Group, Inc.
Defendant: M/V ZHEN ZHU HAI, Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. and South Jersey Port Corp.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02018
Filed: April 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Pascal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Initial Conference set for 7/5/2023 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/7/2023. (amv)
June 6, 2023 Filing 12 South Jersey Port Corp.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against M/V ZHEN ZHU HAI, PAN OCEAN CO. LTD. by SOUTH JERSEY PORT CORP..(SKAND, DAVID)
June 6, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by PAN OCEAN CO. LTD..(WERNER, JON)
June 6, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAN OCEAN CO. LTD. identifying Harim Holdings Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (WERNER, JON)
May 22, 2023 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, South Jersey Port Corp.. Attorney DAVID P. SKAND,ROBERT P. ZOLLER for SOUTH JERSEY PORT CORP. added. (SKAND, DAVID)
May 22, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SOUTH JERSEY PORT CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/6/2023. (amv)
May 19, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PAN OCEAN CO. LTD. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/7/2023. (amv)
May 18, 2023 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to PAN OCEAN CO. LTD.. Attorney JON WERNER for PAN OCEAN CO. LTD. added. (WERNER, JON)
May 17, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on David Bulakowski, on behalf of Registered Agent for Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. on 05/03/2023, filed by MARCO CAPITAL, INC., MICKEY GROUP, INC.. (CASEY, MARTIN)
May 10, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARCO CAPITAL, INC., MICKEY GROUP, INC.. SOUTH JERSEY PORT CORP. served on 5/2/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. (CASEY, MARTIN)
April 12, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARCO CAPITAL, INC., MICKEY GROUP, INC.. (CASEY, MARTIN)
April 12, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to M/V ZHEN ZHU HAI, PAN OCEAN CO. LTD., SOUTH JERSEY PORT CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
April 12, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 submitted by MARTIN F. CASEY on 4/10/2023 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jab)
April 12, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by MARTIN F. CASEY on 4/10/2023 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (jab)
April 12, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
April 10, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by Marco Capital, Inc., Mickey Group, Inc. as to Pan Ocean Co. Ltd., South Jersey Port Corp.. (CASEY, MARTIN)
April 10, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marco Capital, Inc., Mickey Group, Inc.. (CASEY, MARTIN) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/12/2023) (jab, ).
April 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V ZHEN ZHU HAI, Pan Ocean Co. Ltd., South Jersey Port Corp. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14234765), filed by Marco Capital, Inc., Mickey Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(CASEY, MARTIN)
April 10, 2023 Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (tf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARCO CAPITAL, INC. et al v. M/V ZHEN ZHU HAI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Capital, Inc.
Represented By: MARTIN F. CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickey Group, Inc.
Represented By: MARTIN F. CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ZHEN ZHU HAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.
Represented By: JON WERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Jersey Port Corp.
Represented By: ROBERT P. ZOLLER
Represented By: DAVID P. SKAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?