MENARD v. UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Veronica M. Menard
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc., UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., HILARY D. GOULD, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 and JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv02295
Filed: April 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER For Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 7/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/15/2023. (dmrr)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by HILARY D. GOULD, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.. (HARTIGAN, KALEIGH)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to and including June 15, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/15/2023. (amv)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Respond by HILARY D. GOULD, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.. (HARTIGAN, KALEIGH)
May 2, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Applications for a Clerk's Extension filed by Defendants on 5/1/2023 were duplicates submitted incorrectly as a #5 Motion for Extension of Time and #6 Application/Petition. In the future, please use the correct event "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr)
May 2, 2023 Clerk's Text Order - The document #6 Application for a Clerk's Extension submitted by UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., HILARY D. GOULD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/16/2023. (dmr)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply for by HILARY D. GOULD, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.. (HARTIGAN, KALEIGH)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by HILARY D. GOULD, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.. (HARTIGAN, KALEIGH)
May 1, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HILARY D. GOULD, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC. identifying United Healthcare Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HARTIGAN, KALEIGH)
April 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. LEAHY on behalf of United Healthcare Services, Inc. (LEAHY, WILLIAM)
April 28, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption, Jurisdiction, Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab)
April 28, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (jab)
April 26, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Services, Inc. identifying UnitedHealth Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HARTIGAN, KALEIGH)
April 25, 2023 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
April 25, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Healthcare Services, Inc. from Superior Court of NJ - Gloucester County, case number GLO-L-001193-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number CNJDC-14272245), filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc..(HARTIGAN, KALEIGH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENARD v. UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica M. Menard
Represented By: JACQUELINE M. VIGILANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: KALEIGH HARTIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. LEAHY
Represented By: KALEIGH HARTIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILARY D. GOULD
Represented By: KALEIGH HARTIGAN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. LEAHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?