NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE et al v. FAIS et al
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE, AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION and NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Defendant: CARI FAIS, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, ROBERT ASARO-ANGELO, NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS IN THE DEPARTMENT OF LAW AND PUBLIC SAFETY and NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 1:2023cv02494
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Christine P O'Hearn
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter. (HARZ, STEVEN)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Directing Parties to submit supplemental briefs; Plaintiff shall file their supplemental brief, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, by Monday, July 3, 2023; Defendants shall file their response, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages by Monday, July 10, 2023; Plaintiffs may file a reply, not to exceed five (5) pages by Thursday, July 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 6/26/2023. (mag)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn: Status Conference held via Zoom on 6/26/2023. (Court Reporter, Camille Pedano (856-576-7015)) (mag)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Letter from Defendants. (LEVY, NATHANIEL)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference on Monday, June 26, 2023 at 12:00pm via Zoom. The Court will provide a Zoom link the day of the conference to counsels' email addresses as they appear on the docket. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 6/21/23. (hem, )
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Transcript of Show Cause Hearing held on 6/13/2023, before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Court Reporter/Transcriber Camille Pedano (856-576-7015). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 7/11/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2023. (mag)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of David Koch, #2 Declaration of Gerald M. Cerza, #3 Declaration of Edward H. Damm, #4 Declaration of CHRISTOPHER MOYES, #5 Declaration of Polly McDonald, #6 Declaration of Juan Carlos Diaz)(HARZ, STEVEN)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/13/2023 re #1 Order to Show Cause for a TRO and PI by Plaintiffs. Decision Reversed. Plaintiff to submit supplemental declaration(s) and briefing no later than June 17, 2023. Defendants shall submit opposition no later than June 21, 2023. Brief shall not exceed 3 pages. (Court Reporter, Camille Pedano (856-576-7015)) (mag)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: The Show Cause Hearing set for 6/13/2023 at 10:00AM is hereby adjourned to 6/13/23 at 10:30AM (time change only) in Camden - Courtroom 5A before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 6/12/23. (hem, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by EVE ELIZABETH WEISSMAN on behalf of All Defendants (WEISSMAN, EVE)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Anthony W. Trotter, Jr., #2 Declaration David Koch, #3 Declaration David Hayes, #4 Declaration Michael M. Sandak, #5 Declaration Elaine J. Balady)(MENZEL, DAVID)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition to Order to Show Cause for a TRO and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Asaro-Angelo, #2 Declaration of Cari Fais)(PALMER, JESSICA)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA L. PALMER on behalf of All Defendants (PALMER, JESSICA)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHANIEL ILAN LEVY on behalf of All Defendants (LEVY, NATHANIEL)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Complaint, Memorandum of Law, Declarations & Order to Show Cause served on Pamela Lawton on behalf of Robert Asaro-Angelo, Commissioner, NJ Dept. of Labor & Workforce Development on May 10, 2023, filed by AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE. (HARZ, STEVEN)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Complaint, Memorandum of Law, Declarations & Order to Show Cause served on Pamela Lawton on behalf of NJ Dept. of Labor & Workforce Development on May 10, 2023, filed by AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE. (HARZ, STEVEN)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Complaint, Memorandum of Law, Declarations & Order to Show Cause served on Ellen Seitz on behalf of the State of New Jersey on May 10, 2023, filed by AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE. (HARZ, STEVEN)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Complaint, Memorandum of Law, Declarations & Order to Show Cause served on Thomasene Chojnowski on behalf of Cari Paris, Acting Director of NJ Div. of Consumer Affairs in dept. of Law & Public Safety on May 10, 2023, filed by AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE. (HARZ, STEVEN)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service on NJ Division of Consumer Affairs in The Department of Law & Public Safety served on Thomasen Chjojnowski on behalf of NJ Div. of Consumer Affairs in Dept. of Law & Public Safety on May 10, 2023, filed by AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE. (HARZ, STEVEN)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE as to why a temporary restraining order should not be entered; Show Cause Hearing set for 6/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 5A before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn; Defendants shall file and serve any response by Friday, May 26, 2023; Plaintiffs may file any reply by Friday, June 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 5/8/2023. (mag)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ROBERT ASARO-ANGELO, CARI FAIS, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT, NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS IN THE DEPARTMENT OF LAW AND PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN BARRY HARZ on behalf of AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE (HARZ, STEVEN)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter from Steven B. Harz, Esq. requesting Newark vicinage. (MENZEL, DAVID)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Michele Siekerka on behalf of New Jersey Business and Industry Association previously filed under Document 1-4 re #1 Complaint, by All Plaintiffs. (MENZEL, DAVID)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RUBIN SININS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SININS, RUBIN)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: The Complaint listed parties that were not uploaded when the case was originally opened. Please ensure you add all parties before uploading your complaint. When selecting the filer(s) and the party(s) the Complaint is filed against you must select each party by holding the ctrl key. Do not select All Plaintiffs All Defendants . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION (MENZEL, DAVID).
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION (MENZEL, DAVID).
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE (MENZEL, DAVID)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14299749), filed by NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(MENZEL, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE et al v. FAIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY STAFFING ALLIANCE
Represented By: STEVEN BARRY HARZ
Represented By: RUBIN SININS
Represented By: DAVID L. MENZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN STAFFING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: STEVEN BARRY HARZ
Represented By: RUBIN SININS
Represented By: DAVID L. MENZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY BUSINESS AND INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: STEVEN BARRY HARZ
Represented By: RUBIN SININS
Represented By: DAVID L. MENZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARI FAIS
Represented By: EVE ELIZABETH WEISSMAN
Represented By: JESSICA L. PALMER
Represented By: NATHANIEL ILAN LEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: EVE ELIZABETH WEISSMAN
Represented By: JESSICA L. PALMER
Represented By: NATHANIEL ILAN LEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT ASARO-ANGELO
Represented By: EVE ELIZABETH WEISSMAN
Represented By: JESSICA L. PALMER
Represented By: NATHANIEL ILAN LEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS IN THE DEPARTMENT OF LAW AND PUBLIC SAFETY
Represented By: NATHANIEL ILAN LEVY
Represented By: EVE ELIZABETH WEISSMAN
Represented By: JESSICA L. PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: EVE ELIZABETH WEISSMAN
Represented By: JESSICA L. PALMER
Represented By: NATHANIEL ILAN LEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?