NFI INDUSTRIES, INC. et al v. HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NFI INDUSTRIES, INC., MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, NFI, LP and NFI LOGISTICS, LLC
Defendant: HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC, LINEAGE LOGISTICS PFS, LLC and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2023cv04167
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Pascal
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee received for C. Ryan Childress: $ 150, receipt number 134771 (jjc, )
September 20, 2023 Filing 22 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel. (SHIVAS, DAVID)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to C. RYAN CHILDRESS, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 9/11/2023. (amv)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/30/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2024. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 4/26/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 9/6/2023. (amv)
September 6, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C. Ryan Childress, Esq. (SHIVAS, DAVID)
September 6, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/6/2023. (bda)
September 1, 2023 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NFI INDUSTRIES, INC.. (SHIVAS, DAVID)
September 1, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Markel Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SHIVAS, DAVID)
September 1, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from Jeffrey A. Jaketic. (JAKETIC, JEFFREY)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 9/6/2023, at 10:30 a.m. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, access code 671813492#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 9/1/2023. (bda)
September 1, 2023 Filing 14 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(SHIVAS, DAVID)
September 1, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
August 31, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Supplement Motion)(SHIVAS, DAVID)
August 31, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, NFI INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(SHIVAS, DAVID)
August 29, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two, Three, Four and Five of the Complaint (MARTIN, THOMAS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by LINEAGE LOGISTICS PFS, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(JAKETIC, JEFFREY)
August 22, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two, Three, Four and Five of the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CIS with Complaint Filed, #2 Exhibit Hub Group Answer to Count 6)(SHIVAS, DAVID)
August 22, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits Opposing Lineage Motion)(SHIVAS, DAVID)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 8/14/2023. (amv)
August 11, 2023 Filing 6 HUB Group ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Count Six and Only Count Six, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against JOHN DOE, LINEAGE LOGISTICS PFS, LLC by HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC.(MARTIN, THOMAS)
August 11, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two, Three, Four and Five of the Complaint. Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
August 10, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by LINEAGE LOGISTICS PFS, LLC. Responses due by 8/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Schenker v. Expeditors, #4 Exhibit Horizon Group v. NJ Sch. Constr., #5 Exhibit Spectraserv v. Middlesex County, #6 Exhibit MJF Elec. v. Toms River, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Statement, #9 Certification)(JAKETIC, JEFFREY)
August 10, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two, Three, Four and Five of the Complaint by HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC. Responses due by 8/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief brief in support of motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed form of order, #3 Certificate of Service certification of service)(MARTIN, THOMAS)
August 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. JAKETIC on behalf of LINEAGE LOGISTICS PFS, LLC (JAKETIC, JEFFREY)
August 6, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmw)
August 6, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Civil Cover Sheet attached to the Notice of Removal #1 filed by Thomas C. Martin, Esq on 8/3/2023 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmw, )
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number CAM-L-001911-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14503398), filed by HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTIN, THOMAS) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/6/2023) (dmw, ).
August 3, 2023 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (mmb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NFI INDUSTRIES, INC. et al v. HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NFI INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: DAVID T. SHIVAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID T. SHIVAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NFI, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NFI LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUB GROUP DEDICATED, LLC
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINEAGE LOGISTICS PFS, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY A. JAKETIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?