PAPASTAMELOS v. AMGEN INC. et al
Plaintiff: M.D. ATHANASIO G. PAPASTAMELOS and ATHANASIO G. PAPASTAMELOS, M.D.
Defendant: AMGEN INC. and LAWRENCE ALITOWSKI
Case Number: 1:2023cv04220
Filed: August 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing this action with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/28/2023. (jab)
September 28, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jab)
September 27, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ATHANASIO G. PAPASTAMELOS, MD. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Hon. Karen M. Williams)(BARBONE, JORDAN)
September 20, 2023 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice . (BARBONE, JORDAN)
September 20, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice. Motion set for 10/16/2023 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (alb, )
September 19, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter requesting the automatic extension of the motion day filed by Jordan L. Barbone on 9/18/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Letter. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE REQUEST USING **Letter Rule 7.1 ** EVENT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (alb, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Jordan L. Barbone. (BARBONE, JORDAN)
August 30, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice by LAWRENCE ALITOWSKI. Responses due by 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(DABBY, KIRA)
August 30, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice. Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (alb, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by AMGEN INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
August 29, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice. Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (alb, )
August 15, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Civil Cover Sheet #1 filed by THOMAS CAFFERTY on 8/8/2023 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (ssp, )
August 11, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend time to Answer submitted by LAWRENCE ALITOWSKI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/30/2023. (ssp, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 6 Diversity Disclosure Statement by LAWRENCE ALITOWSKI. (DABBY, KIRA)
August 10, 2023 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to LAWRENCE ALITOWSKI.. (DABBY, KIRA)
August 9, 2023 Filing 4 Diversity Disclosure Statement by AMGEN INC.. (CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
August 9, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
August 9, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time to Answer submitted by AMGEN INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/29/2023. (ssp, )
August 9, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (ssp, )
August 8, 2023 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to AMGEN INC. Application for a Clerk's Extension of Time To Answer.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
August 8, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMGEN INC. identifying AMGEN INC. as Corporate Parent.. (CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
August 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMGEN INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey - Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-001101-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14510483), filed by AMGEN INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Statement Rule 11.2, #4 Statement Rule 10.1, #5 Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal)(CAFFERTY, THOMAS) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/15/2023) (ssp, ).
August 8, 2023 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAPASTAMELOS v. AMGEN INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. ATHANASIO G. PAPASTAMELOS
Represented By: JORDAN BARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHANASIO G. PAPASTAMELOS, M.D.
Represented By: JORDAN BARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMGEN INC.
Represented By: THOMAS JOSEPH CAFFERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE ALITOWSKI
Represented By: KIRA SAMUELLE DABBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?