THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC et al v. EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD. et al
Plaintiff: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED and MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.
Defendant: EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD., EUGIA US LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, MANKIND PHARMA LTD., LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., ACCORD HEALTHCARE, LTD., INTAS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED, CIPLA LIMITED and CIPLA USA, INC.
Counter Claimant: LUPIN INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv06667
Filed: August 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. ORDERED that Civil Actions 23-926 and 23-6667 are consolidated for all purposes; ORDERED that all filings in the Consolidated Actions shall use the 23-926 Action caption; ORDERED that all filings going forward shall be filed in the 23-926 Action and that the 23-6667 Action shall be administratively terminated. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/28/2023. (dmr)
September 29, 2023 Cases associated: Create association to 1:23-cv-00926-KMW-AMD. (dmr)
September 29, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
September 25, 2023 Filing 31 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Karen M. Williams, U.S.D.J. Enclosing Proposed Consolidation Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Defendant TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/25/2023. (amv)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Initial Conference set for 10/24/2023 at 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/22/2023. (amv)
September 22, 2023 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC. identifying InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cipla (EU Limited), and Cipla Limited as Corporate Parent.. (TOR, LOLY)
September 22, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC. by CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC..(TOR, LOLY)
September 22, 2023 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES)
September 22, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by LUPIN INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RICHTER, JAMES)
September 22, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RAY DARBEE on behalf of LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, MANKIND PHARMA LTD. (DARBEE, MICHAEL)
September 22, 2023 Filing 23 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, MANKIND PHARMA LTD.. (LESSLER, JAY)
September 22, 2023 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, MANKIND PHARMA LTD.. (LESSLER, JAY)
September 22, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, MANKIND PHARMA LTD..(LESSLER, JAY)
September 21, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of LUPIN INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (RICHTER, JAMES)
September 21, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD., EUGIA US LLC identifying Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Mviyes Pharma Ventures Private Limited and Eugia Pharma Specialities Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (MYER, R)
September 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by LOLY G. TOR on behalf of CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC. (TOR, LOLY)
September 21, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD., EUGIA US LLC.(MYER, R)
September 20, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED. (VAN BUSKIRK, TEDD)
September 20, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED.(VAN BUSKIRK, TEDD)
September 18, 2023 Filing 14 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Karen M. Williams, U.S.D.J. Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing without Prejudice Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Amendment of Caption. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Defendant LUPIN LTD. without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/15/2023. (amv)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Defendants ACCORD HEALTHCARE, LTD. and INTAS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/13/2023. (amv)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Ann Marie Donio, U.S.M.J. Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed and Order Regarding Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendants Accord Healthcare, Ltd. and Intas Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Amending Caption to Reflect the Same, and Personal Jurisdiction, Venue, and Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 8, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Ann Marie Donio, U.S.M.J. Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendant Lupin Ltd., Amending Caption to Reflect the Same, and Personal Jurisdiction, Venue, and Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 8, 2023 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., ACCORD HEALTHCARE, LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC., EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD., EUGIA US LLC, INTAS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MANKIND PHARMA LTD., ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
August 24, 2023 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ssp, )
August 24, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
August 21, 2023 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
August 21, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 21, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., ACCORD HEALTHCARE, LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC., EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD., EUGIA US LLC, INTAS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MANKIND PHARMA LTD., ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14555506) , Related Case Selected, filed by THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC et al v. EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD.
Represented By: R TOUHEY MYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGIA US LLC
Represented By: R TOUHEY MYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: R TOUHEY MYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED
Represented By: R TOUHEY MYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANKIND PHARMA LTD.
Represented By: JAY P. LESSLER
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC
Represented By: JAY P. LESSLER
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCORD HEALTHCARE, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTAS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: JAMES S. RICHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED
Represented By: TEDD WILLIAM VAN BUSKIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIPLA LIMITED
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIPLA USA, INC.
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: LUPIN INC.
Represented By: JAMES S. RICHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?