MORROW et al v. PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DONNA MORROW, an incapacitated person, by and through her Co-Guardians, GAIL LAWRENCE, TERRI GIACOBBE and DONNA MORROW
Defendant: PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC d/b/a MANORCARE HEALTH SERVICES WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP & PROMEDICA SKILLED NURSING AND REHABILITATION, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HCR MANORCARE, INC, HCR HEALTHCARE LLC, PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC doing business as MANORCARE HEALTH SERVICES - WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP & PROMEDICA SKILLED NURSING AND REHABILITATION, HCR MANORCARE, INC., ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES (1-10), JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS (1-15), JANE DOE NURSES (1-15) and JANE DOE TECHNICIANS, CERTIFIED NURSING AIDES, AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-15)
Case Number: 1:2023cv16866
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Pascal
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 10/30/2023. (alb, )
October 27, 2023 Filing 15 Proposed Order Discovery Confidentiality Order by All Plaintiffs. (TRIMBLE, JOHN)
October 16, 2023 Filing 14 Joint Diversity Disclosure Statement by HCR HEALTHCARE LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (HEICKLEN, ERIC)
October 16, 2023 Clerk's office updated Plaintiff's Attorney information for clerical error. (dmw)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2023. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 4/1/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 10/11/2023. (dmr)
October 11, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/11/2023. (bda)
October 10, 2023 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by HCR HEALTHCARE LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(HEICKLEN, ERIC)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 10/11/2023, at 10:00 AM shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, access code 83401130#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 10/10/2023. (bda)
October 6, 2023 Filing 10 Joint Discovery Plan by ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES (1-10), HCR HEALTHCARE LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC., JANE DOE NURSES (1-15), JANE DOE TECHNICIANS, CERTIFIED NURSING AIDES, AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-15), PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC..(HEICKLEN, ERIC)
October 2, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by TERRI GIACOBBE, GAIL LAWRENCE, DONNA MORROW re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (TRIMBLE, JOHN)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 Diversity Disclosure Statement by TERRI GIACOBBE, GAIL LAWRENCE, DONNA MORROW. (TRIMBLE, JOHN)
September 20, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 10/16/2023 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HCR MANORCARE, INC., HCR HEALTHCARE LLC Responses due by 10/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(HEICKLEN, ERIC) Modified on 9/19/2023 (jab).
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 10/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 9/14/2023. (dmr)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC identifying N/A as Corporate Parent.. (HEICKLEN, ERIC)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal,,, Signature Page by PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC. (HEICKLEN, ERIC)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC. (HEICKLEN, ERIC)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC.(HEICKLEN, ERIC) Modified on 9/13/2023 (jab).
September 12, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 filed by ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN on 9/6/2023 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jab)
September 12, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CIVIL COVER SHEET #1 -2 filed by ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN on 9/6/2023 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (jab)
September 12, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jab)
September 12, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
September 12, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 submitted by ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN on 9/6/2023 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jab)
September 12, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The STATE COURT COMPLAINT #1 -1 submitted by JOHN W. TRIMBLE appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jab)
September 6, 2023 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (mmb, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC d/b/a MANORCARE HEALTH SERVICES WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP & PROMEDICA SKILLED NURSING AND REHABILITATION, HCR HEALTHCARE LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF GLOUCESTER COUNTY, case number GLO-L-840-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14651260), filed by PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC d/b/a MANORCARE HEALTH SERVICES WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP & PROMEDICA SKILLED NURSING AND REHABILITATION, HCR HEALTHCARE LLC, HCR MANORCARE, INC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 Certification RULE 11.2 CERTIFICATION, #4 Certification RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #5 Certification RULE 7.1(A)(2) DISCLOSURE RE DIVERSITY, #6 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(HEICKLEN, ERIC) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/12/2023) (jab, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORROW et al v. PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA MORROW, an incapacitated person, by and through her Co-Guardians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL LAWRENCE
Represented By: JOHN W. TRIMBLE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI GIACOBBE
Represented By: JOHN W. TRIMBLE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA MORROW
Represented By: JOHN W. TRIMBLE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC d/b/a MANORCARE HEALTH SERVICES WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP & PROMEDICA SKILLED NURSING AND REHABILITATION
Represented By: ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR MANORCARE, INC
Represented By: ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR HEALTHCARE LLC
Represented By: ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTFOLIO ONE, LLC doing business as MANORCARE HEALTH SERVICES - WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP & PROMEDICA SKILLED NURSING AND REHABILITATION
Represented By: ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR MANORCARE, INC.
Represented By: ERIC DANIEL HEICKLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS (1-15)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE NURSES (1-15)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE TECHNICIANS, CERTIFIED NURSING AIDES, AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-15)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?