LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C. v. LEWIS et al
Plaintiff: LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.
Defendant: LADEL LEWIS, LINDA ANN POHLY, FLORENDA LEE-HALL, JOYCE ANN WILSON and VEDA DIANE BALLA
Case Number: 1:2023cv20985
Filed: October 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Frederick A. Berg to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14910441.) (MAKHAIL, MARK)
December 1, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sheldon H. Klein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14910430.) (MAKHAIL, MARK)
December 1, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SHELDON H. KLEIN and FREDERICK A. BERG, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Frederick A. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/28/2023. (dmr)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sheldon H. Klein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/28/2023. (dmr)
November 20, 2023 Filing 25 Letter from LWRENCE a kATZ. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
November 20, 2023 Filing 24 Letter from Defendant Ladel Lewis Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
November 20, 2023 Filing 23 Letter from Lawrence A Kattz. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon the filing of letters requesting a pre-motion conference by Defendant Joyce Ann Wilson (Docket No. 11), Defendant Linda Ann Pohly (Docket No. 20), and Defendant Veda Diane Balla (Docket No. 20). All defendants request leave to file a motion to dismiss for, among other reasons, lack of personal jurisdiction. Defendant Pohly requests, in the alternative, that the Court transfer this matter to the Eastern District of Michigan. Pursuant to this Court's Individual Rules and Procedures I.A., Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendant Wilson's letter has expired. Thus, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall so cause no later than the end of business on November 22, 2023, on why Plaintiff has failed to timely respond to Defendant Wilson's letter AND why the relief Defendant Wilson seeks should not be granted. Because Defendants Pohly and Balla seek substantially similar relief as Defendant Wilson, Plaintiff must respond to those letters by the November 22nd deadline. If Plaintiff fails to respond to those letters by the November 22nd deadline, the Court will likely grant the relief that Defendants' motions seek. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/17/2023. (Costigan, Roberta)
November 15, 2023 Filing 21 Letter from Marc B Zingarini Esquire. (ZINGARINI, MARC)
November 14, 2023 Filing 20 Letter from Chris Malikschmitt, Esq. Requesting Pre-Motion Conference.. (MALIKSCHMITT, CHRISTOPHER)
November 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MALIKSCHMITT on behalf of LINDA ANN POHLY (MALIKSCHMITT, CHRISTOPHER)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon the filing of a motion to dismiss by Defendant Veda Diane Balla (Docket No. 17). The motion will be Administratively Terminated as improperly filed. Pursuant to the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures I.A., a party seeking to file a motion to dismiss must file a pre-motion conference letter setting forth the basis for the anticipated motion with citations to relevant authority. Signed By Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/14/2023. (Costigan, Roberta)
November 14, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion set for 12/18/2023 before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
November 13, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by VEDA DIANE BALLA. Responses due by 11/13/2023. (ZINGARINI, MARC)
November 13, 2023 Clerk's Text Order - The document #14 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LADEL LEWIS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/27/2023. (dmr)
November 13, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
November 10, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LADEL LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kristofor T. Henning in Support of pro hac vice Motion, #2 Declaration of Frederick A. Berg, #3 Statement No Brief Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
November 10, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LADEL LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kristofor T. Henning in Support of pro hac vice Motion, #2 Declaration of Sheldon H. Klein, #3 Statement No Brief Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ladel Lewis.. (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. MAKHAIL on behalf of LADEL LEWIS (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 9, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTOFOR T. HENNING on behalf of LADEL LEWIS (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 Letter from Gregg D. Weinstock. (WEINSTOCK, GREGG)
November 7, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter #10 filed by Gregg D. Weinstock on 11/6/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE RESUBMIT using the "Letter" event found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss request leave to proceed by JOYCE ANN WILSON. (WEINSTOCK, GREGG)
November 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG DOUGLAS WEINSTOCK on behalf of JOYCE ANN WILSON (WEINSTOCK, GREGG)
November 6, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.. LINDA ANN POHLY served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.. VEDA DIANE BALLA served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
October 23, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.. LADEL LEWIS served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
October 23, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.. JOYCE ANN WILSON served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.. FLORENDA LEE-HALL served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VEDA DIANE BALLA, FLORENDA LEE-HALL, LADEL LEWIS, LINDA ANN POHLY, JOYCE ANN WILSON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
October 11, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
October 11, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ssp, )
October 11, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (ssp, )
October 9, 2023 Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
October 9, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
October 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14773367) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(KATZ, LAWRENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C. v. LEWIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENTO LAW GROUP, P.C.
Represented By: LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LADEL LEWIS
Represented By: KRISTOFOR T. HENNING
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA ANN POHLY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MALIKSCHMITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORENDA LEE-HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOYCE ANN WILSON
Represented By: GREGG DOUGLAS WEINSTOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEDA DIANE BALLA
Represented By: MARC B. ZINGARINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?