ABED v. LIN et al
Plaintiff: ALBERT ABED
Defendant: WEI LIN, MELISSA MONCADA, YY TRADE, INC. and WEI WHOLESALE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv21059
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter (ECF No. 10) and Defendant's letter (ECF No. 11) regarding the Show Cause hearing on preliminary injunction as well as Defendant's cross motion to dismiss (ECF No. 9). The Court notes that Defendant consents to Plaintiff's request to adjourn the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court hereby ORDERS the Show Cause Hearing on Plaintiff's preliminary injunction previously set for December 1, 2023, to be adjourned to December 20, 2023 at 11:00 am in Camden - Courtroom 4A. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/30/23. (nar)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 Letter from Matthew Sava in Response to Plaintiff's Letter of Today's Date re #10 Letter. (SAVA, MATTHEW)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 Letter re #9 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (SCHWARTZ, NOAH)
November 30, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #9 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ssp, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by YY TRADE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Cross-Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Yiming Yang, #3 Declaration of Zheng Gao, #4 Exhibit 1_Complaint, #5 Exhibit 2_NY Certificate of Incorporation, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SAVA, MATTHEW)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER The Court reviewed Defendant YY Trade, Inc.'s letter dated November 20, 2023 requesting the Order to Show Cause hearing scheduled for November 21, 2023 be adjourned. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's request and hereby ORDERS the Order to Show Cause Hearing to be rescheduled for December 1, 2023 at 10:00 AM. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/21/2023.(dd)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Letter re #6 MOTION to Continue Order to Show Cause Hearing MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion. (SCHWARTZ, NOAH)
November 21, 2023 Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 4A before Judge Karen M. Williams. (ssp, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue Order to Show Cause Hearing, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion by YY TRADE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Yiming Yang), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (certificate of incorporation of NY entity))(SAVA, MATTHEW)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Order to Show Cause served on Melissa Moncada and YY Trade Inc on 10/27/23, filed by ALBERT ABED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(SCHWARTZ, NOAH)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why A Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/21/2023 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4A before Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/13/2023. (dmr)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WEI LIN, MELISSA MONCADA, WEI WHOLESALE, LLC, YY TRADE, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
October 12, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
October 11, 2023 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw )
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ALBERT ABED. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(SCHWARTZ, NOAH)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14779702) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALBERT ABED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHWARTZ, NOAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABED v. LIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT ABED
Represented By: NOAH A. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEI LIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA MONCADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YY TRADE, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW SAVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEI WHOLESALE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?