GENENTECH, INC. et al v. DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. and BIOGEN INC.
Defendant: DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES SA, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LTD., FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC, FRESENIUS KABI SWISSBIOSIM GMBH and FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Case Number: 1:2023cv22485
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 24 Letter from Eric I. Abraham to Hon. Matthew J. Skahill, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
January 10, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MURTHA on behalf of DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LTD., DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES SA, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, FRESENIUS KABI SWISSBIOSIM GMBH, FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (MURTHA, WILLIAM)
January 10, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO on behalf of DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LTD., DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES SA, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, FRESENIUS KABI SWISSBIOSIM GMBH, FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (ORLANDO, STEPHANIE-ROSE)
January 10, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LTD., DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES SA, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, FRESENIUS KABI SWISSBIOSIM GMBH, FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
December 27, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Y. JOHN LU, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, )
December 26, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Y. John Lu to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14966865.) (MAKHAIL, MARK)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Y. John Lu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 12/22/2023. (dmr)
December 21, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, LAUREN DRAKE and DAVID GINDLER, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr)
December 21, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BIOGEN INC., GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Cynthia Betz in Support of pro hac vice Motion, #2 Declaration of Y. John Lu in Support of pro hac vice Motion, #3 Statement No Brief Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BETZ, CYNTHIA)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David Gindler to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14954228.) (MAKHAIL, MARK)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lauren Drake to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14954212.) (MAKHAIL, MARK)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 , #14 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Gindler, Esquire and Lauren Drake, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 12/15/2023. (dmr)
December 14, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BIOGEN INC., GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Cynthia Betz in Support of pro hac vice Motion, #2 Declaration of Lauren Drake in Support of pro hac vice Motion, #3 Statement No Brief Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BETZ, CYNTHIA)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BIOGEN INC., GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Cynthia Betz in Support of pro hac vice Motion, #2 Declaration of David Gindler in Support of pro hac vice Motion, #3 Statement No Brief Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BETZ, CYNTHIA)
December 1, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,485,704, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 7,976,838, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 8,460,895, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 8,512,983, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 8,574,869, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 9,714,293, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 10,017,732, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Patent No. 10,336,983, #9 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. 10,450,379, #10 Exhibit 10 - U.S. Patent No. 10,654,940, #11 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 10,662,237, #12 Exhibit 12 - U.S. Patent No. 10,676,710, #13 Exhibit 13 - U.S. Patent No. 10,759,866, #14 Exhibit 14 - U.S. Patent No. 10,829,732, #15 Exhibit 15 - U.S. Patent No. 10,982,003) (ssp, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIOGEN INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., GENENTECH, INC.. FRESENIUS KABI SWISSBIOSIM GMBH waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIOGEN INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., GENENTECH, INC.. FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIOGEN INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., GENENTECH, INC.. DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LTD. waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIOGEN INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., GENENTECH, INC.. FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIOGEN INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., GENENTECH, INC.. DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES SA waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIOGEN INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., GENENTECH, INC.. DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 22, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
November 17, 2023 Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw)
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. MAKHAIL on behalf of BIOGEN INC., GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIOGEN INC.. (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. identifying Roche Holding Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENENTECH, INC. identifying Roche Holding Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LTD., DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES SA, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, FRESENIUS KABI SWISSBIOSIM GMBH, FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14882103) with JURY DEMAND , Related Case Selected, filed by BIOGEN INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., GENENTECH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,485,704, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 7,976,838, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 8,460,895, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 8,512,983, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 8,574,869, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 9,714,293, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 10,017,732, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Patent No. 10,336,983, #9 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. 10,450,379, #10 Exhibit 10 - U.S. Patent No. 10,654,940, #11 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 10,662,237, #12 Exhibit 12 - U.S. Patent No. 10,676,710, #13 Exhibit 13 - U.S. Patent No. 10,759,866, #14 Exhibit 14 - U.S. Patent No. 10,829,732, #15 Exhibit 15 - U.S. Patent No. 10,982,003, #16 Exhibit 16 - Fresenius March 2022 Company Presentation, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(BETZ, CYNTHIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENENTECH, INC. et al v. DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENENTECH, INC.
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIOGEN INC.
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES SA
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LTD.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS KABI SWISSBIOSIM GMBH
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?