THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC et al v. EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD. et al
Plaintiff: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED and MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.
Defendant: EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD., EUGIA US LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, MANKIND PHARMA LTD., LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED, CIPLA LIMITED and CIPLA USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00150
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION between Plaintiffs and Defendants Lupin Inc. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. The Parties stipulate and agree that all claims, counterclaims, and affirmative defenses asserted by the Parties against each other in the Actions are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/29/2024. (dmr)
February 28, 2024 Filing 18 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Karen M. Williams, U.S.D.J. Enclosing Proposed Stipulated Consent Judgment and Injunction (Lupin). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 1, 2024 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC. identifying InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cipla (EU Limited), and Cipla Limited as Corporate Parent.. (TOR, LOLY)
February 1, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC. by CIPLA USA, INC., CIPLA LIMITED.(TOR, LOLY)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSOLIDATION ORDER: 23-cv-926 and 24-cv-150 are consolidated for all purposes. All filings going forward shall be filed in the 926 Action and the 150 Action shall be administratively terminated. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/1/2024. (jab)
February 1, 2024 ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (dmw)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Defendant Lupin Ltd. without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/30/2024. (ssp, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 13 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Karen M. Williams, U.S.D.J. Enclosing Proposed Consolidation Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 30, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of LUPIN INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (RICHTER, JAMES)
January 29, 2024 Filing 11 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Karen M. Williams, U.S.D.J. Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendant Lupin Ltd., Amending Caption to Reflect the Same, and Personal Jurisdiction, Venue, and Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 29, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note this case was incorrectly closed by the Clerk's Office on 1/26/2024 and has been reopened. Please disregard. (ssp, )
January 26, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/26/2024. (ssp,)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER REGARDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before February 1, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/25/2024. (jab)
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Ann Marie Donio, U.S.M.J. Enclosing Proposed Consent Order Regarding Deadline To Respond to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 12, 2024 Filing 7 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Karen M. Williams, U.S.D.J. Enclosing Stipulated Consent Judgment and Injunction (Orbicular). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TEDD WILLIAM VAN BUSKIRK on behalf of ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED (VAN BUSKIRK, TEDD)
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (jab)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC., EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD., EUGIA US LLC, LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MANKIND PHARMA LTD., ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
January 10, 2024 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
January 10, 2024 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (mmb, )
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 9, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC., EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD., EUGIA US LLC, LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC, LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MANKIND PHARMA LTD., ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-14998152) , Related Case Selected, filed by THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC., THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC, THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED, MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC et al v. EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA R&D IP, LLC
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA US, INC.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERAVANCE BIOPHARMA IRELAND LIMITED
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYLAN IRELAND LIMITED
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYLAN SPECIALTY L.P.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALITIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGIA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANKIND PHARMA LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN INC.
Represented By: JAMES S. RICHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: JAMES S. RICHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORBICULAR PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED
Represented By: TEDD WILLIAM VAN BUSKIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIPLA LIMITED
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIPLA USA, INC.
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?