CUSHING v. GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP et al
Plaintiff: DAVID CUSHING
Defendant: GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP, FREEDOM MORTGAGE, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE CORP. doing business as MR. COOPER, LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC and US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2024cv05742
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order #12 MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motion to be decided by the District Judge. (rss, )
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's request for a 30-day extension to file opposition papers to the #9 , #10 , and #11 Motions to Dismiss; Dismissing #12 Motion for Extension of Time as moot. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/17/2024. (sms2)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion set for 7/15/2024 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmw)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS by DAVID CUSHING.(Received via ECF help desk) (dmw )
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II & III of the Verified Complaint as to Defendant Greentree Mortgage Company, LP by GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP. Responses due by 7/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certification, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(LAW, LAUREN)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II & III of the Verified Complaint as to Defendant Greentree Mortgage Company, LP no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motion to be decided by the District Judge. (sms2)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II & III of the Verified Complaint as to Defendant Greentree Mortgage Company, LP. Motion set for 7/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint as to Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Motion set for 7/15/2024 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint as to Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by FREEDOM MORTGAGE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Verified Complaint as to Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #2 Declaration of Robert Bailey, Esq., dated June 11, 2024, #3 Exhibit A - December 16, 2021, Transfer of Service Letter, #4 Exhibit B - Voluntary Petition in Bankruptcy Court Plaintiff Filed on December 19, 2023, #5 Exhibit C - Schedules Plaintiff Filed in Bankruptcy Court on January 22, 2024, #6 Exhibit D - Bankruptcy Court Order Dismissing Case, dated February 15, 2024, #7 Exhibit E - Bankruptcy Court Order to Show Cause, dated January 22, 2024, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Declaration of Service)(BAILEY, ROBERT)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of the Lakeview Defendants to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6). Motion set for 7/1/2024 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of the Lakeview Defendants to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE CORP., US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Responses due by 7/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss of the Lakeview Defendants to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to FED. R.CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit Note, #3 Exhibit Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage, #6 Exhibit AOM to Lakeview, #7 Exhibit QC Deed, #8 Exhibit QC Deed 2, #9 Exhibit QC Deed 3, #10 Exhibit S&C, #11 Exhibit Answer, #12 Exhibit Order, #13 Exhibit Emergent, #14 Exhibit 1.6.23 Order, #15 Exhibit Final Judgment Motion, #16 Exhibit JFS, #17 Exhibit S&C, #18 Declaration Declaration of Harold L. Kofman, Esq. in Support of Lakeview Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #19 Text of Proposed Order Notice of Motion of the Lakeview Defendants to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), #20 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement for Nationstar Mortgage LLC D/B/A Mr. Cooper, #21 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, #22 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement for U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee)(KOFMAN, HAROLD)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #7 submitted by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE CORP., LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, and US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION on 5/28/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/11/2024. (sms2)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney HAROLD L. KOFMAN for LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC,HAROLD L. KOFMAN for NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE CORP.,HAROLD L. KOFMAN for US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION added. (KOFMAN, HAROLD)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by DAVID CUSHING. Received via the ECF Help Desk. (sms2)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to Defendants' Applications for Extension of Time filed by DAVID CUSHING. (Received via ECF Help Desk) (dmr)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to Complaint. Attorney ROBERT D. BAILEY for FREEDOM MORTGAGE added. (BAILEY, ROBERT)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP. Attorney LAUREN M. LAW for GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP added. (LAW, LAUREN)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FREEDOM MORTGAGE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/11/2024. (jab)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/13/2024. (jab)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID CUSHING. FREEDOM MORTGAGE served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/28/2024; GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP served on 5/9/2024, answer due 5/30/2024; LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/28/2024; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE CORP. served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/28/2024; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Received via ECF Help Desk). (jab,N.M.)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FREEDOM MORTGAGE, GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP, LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE CORP., US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmw, summons given to plaintiff at counter)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FREEDOM MORTGAGE, GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP, LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE CORP., US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number CAM15004) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DAVID CUSHING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits) (dmw, NEF given to plaintiff at Counter)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmw, Notice given to plaintiff at counter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUSHING v. GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CUSHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENTREE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LP
Represented By: LAUREN M. LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREEDOM MORTGAGE
Represented By: ROBERT D. BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE CORP. doing business as MR. COOPER
Represented By: HAROLD L. KOFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: HAROLD L. KOFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: HAROLD L. KOFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?