DUBOSE et al v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY et al
Plaintiff: URMAJESTY BANKTRUCKFIT SOLUTIONS INC. and ZUMAR H. DUBOSE
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY and NEW JERSEY ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 1:2024cv06228
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 #4 Order of Withdrawal of Complaint sent to Plaintiff via regular U.S. mail. (sms2, n.m.)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF COMPLAINT. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/14/2024. (sms2, n.m.)
May 21, 2024 Filing 3 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (sms2)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (sms2)
May 17, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that although an individual is entitled to proceed pro se, a corporation must be represented by counsel. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (sms2)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint Received. No IFP/FF received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (sms2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUBOSE et al v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: URMAJESTY BANKTRUCKFIT SOLUTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZUMAR H. DUBOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?