NXIVM CORPORATION et al v. ROSS INSTITUTE et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv01051
Filed: March 7, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M. Cavanaugh
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 841 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 8/26/19. (cm, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 747 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/28/17. (sr, )
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER denying in part 661 Motion to Seal.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/21/17. (tjg, )
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 518 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 12/18/13. (sr, )
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 504 OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 6/26/13. (DD, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 6/9/10. (sr, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 11/30/09. (DD, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NXIVM CORPORATION et al v. ROSS INSTITUTE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?