MAC NAUGHTON v. HARMELECH et al
Plaintiff: W. JAMES MAC NAUGHTON
Defendant: SHAI HARMELECH and CABLE AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv05450
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Presiding Judge: Peter G. Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that plaintiff's objections (ECF no. 427) to the R&R(ECF no. 426) are denied, the 426 Report and Recommendations is affirmed and adopted, and the application for attorney's fees is therefore denied. The clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/12/17. (sr, )
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 CLERK' ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part re 437 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Plaintiff W. JAMES MAC NAUGHTON and JUDGMENT be entered on costs in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants SHAI HARMELECH, CABLE AMERICA, INC., d/b/a Satellite America and USA SATELLITE & CABLE, INC. in the amount of $5,934.10. (William T. Walsh, Clerk) (jo, ) Modified on 12/23/2016 (jo). (Order mailed via first class to Shai Harmelech.)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER DENYING defendants' motion stay enforcement of the judgment pending appeal and without bond or alternatively with a reduction in the amount of the bond, re 430 Application/Petition. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/1/16. (cm )
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/13/16. (cm )
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMORANDUM OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/11/13. (sr, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/30/12. (sr, )
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/22/10. (sr, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that defts' time to file & serve their replies on their pending motions to dismiss and/or transfer and for pro hac vice admission of Donald F. Spak is extended until 4/19/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Esther Salas on 4/6/10. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAC NAUGHTON v. HARMELECH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. JAMES MAC NAUGHTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAI HARMELECH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CABLE AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?