BLACKSHEAR et al v. SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KEITH BLACKSHEAR and JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR
Defendant: WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC., BELL LABORATORIES, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC., PRENTISS INCORPORATED, SPECKOZ, INC., JT EATON & CO., ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PRODUCTS, SANDOZ AGRO, INC., BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, CORBETT EXTERMINATING, WELLMARK INTERNATIONAL, RICHARD ROES 1-100, JOHN DOES 1-100, DEF COMPANY, LIPHA TECH INC. and DOW AGROSCIENCES, LLC
Cross Defendant: PHV SHANE A. ANDERSON, PHV JAMES E. SPRINGER II and PHV JOHN P. MANDLER
Case Number: 2:2010cv03585
Filed: July 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Patty Shwartz
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2011 Filing 194 Letter remanding action Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County (nr, )
November 2, 2011 Filing 193 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR, KEITH BLACKSHEAR as to JT Eaton & Co. and Dow Agrosciences, LLC on Fourth Amended Complaint. (jd, )
October 31, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 10/31/2011. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER on Informal Application that, no later than 11/4/11, pltf shall provide deft Wellmark with copies of all expert reports, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/31/11. (jd, )
October 31, 2011 ***Civil Case Terminated. (nr, )
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying deft's #105 Motion to Dismiss; pursuant to Magistrate Judge Shwartz's order of 9/22/2010 remanding action to Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 10/31/2011. (nr, )
October 31, 2011 Filing 190 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 10/31/2011. (nr, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER on Informal Application that the pltfs' request that the Court reconsider the portion of its 10/17/11 Order denying the request to file an Amended Complaint joining McLaughlin Gomely King Co. is denied, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/27/11. (jd, )
October 27, 2011 Filing 188 Letter from Jeanine D. Clark. (CLARK, JEANINE)
October 27, 2011 Filing 187 Letter from Russell S. Burnside, Esq. to Hon. Patty Shwartz, U.S.M.J.. (BURNSIDE, RUSSELL)
October 25, 2011 Filing 186 Substitution of Attorney (MILLER, H.)
October 25, 2011 Filing 185 Letter from Defendants, Bayer CropScience LP, Corbett Exterminating, LiphaTech, Inc., Prentiss Incorporated, Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc., and Whitmire Micro-Gen Research Laboratories, Inc.. (DELANEY, CHRISTINE)
October 24, 2011 Filing 184 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WELLMARK INTERNATIONAL.(BURNSIDE, RUSSELL)
October 24, 2011 Filing 182 SUMMONS ISSUED Fourth Amended Complaint as to DOW AGROSCIENCES, LLC, ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PRODUCTS, JT EATON & CO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Jane DelleMonache* (jd, )
October 21, 2011 Filing 183 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/17/11, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sara L. Kern/King Transcription Service, Telephone number 973 237 6080. Tape Number: Opinion. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2012. (tjg, )
October 21, 2011 Filing 181 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Amended Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Guardian ad Litem for Bryonna Blackshear), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Administratrix of the Estate of Keith Blackshear, deceased), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(Individually), KEITH BLACKSHEAR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Reserving Rights Under Dkt. 180, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(RINALDO, RICHARD)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 TEXT ORDER, No later than October 26, 2011, the defendants shall file a letter in response to the plaintiff's October 20, 2011 request for reconsideration of the portion of the Order denying leave to join McLaughlin Gormley King Company. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/21/11. (Liriano, I)
October 20, 2011 Filing 179 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granted and denied #163 Motion to Amend/Correct, etc.; the Fourth Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 10/21/11, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/17/11. (jd, )
October 6, 2011 Filing 177 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re #163 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, CORBETT EXTERMINATING, LIPHA TECH INC., PRENTISS INCORPORATED, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC., WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.. (DELANEY, CHRISTINE)
October 5, 2011 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER: Application (doc #5) for an extension of time is granted. Answer Due 10/24/11 as to Wellmark International (jd, )
October 5, 2011 Filing 175 Letter from Russell S. Burnside on behalf of defendant Wellmark International requesting an automatic 15 day extension to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. (BURNSIDE, RUSSELL)
October 4, 2011 Filing 176 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR, etal as to Wellmark International on 9/20/11(jd, )
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER on Informal Application that the defts' request to submit a surreply is granted. The surreply shall be submitted no later than 10/6/11, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/3/11. (jd, )
October 2, 2011 Filing 173 Letter from Bayer CropScience LP, Prentiss Incorporated, Corbett Exterminating, Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc., LiphaTech, Inc., and Whitmire Micro-Gen Research Laboratories, Inc.. (DELANEY, CHRISTINE)
September 30, 2011 Filing 172 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re #163 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint To Add Additional Defendants filed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Guardian ad Litem for Bryonna Blackshear), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Administratrix of the Estate of Keith Blackshear, deceased), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Richard P. Rinaldo in Support of Reply Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(RINALDO, RICHARD)
September 23, 2011 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #163 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, CORBETT EXTERMINATING, LIPHA TECH INC., PRENTISS INCORPORATED, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC., WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.. (FISH, ERIC)
September 23, 2011 Filing 169 CERTIFICATION in Opposition re #163 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, CORBETT EXTERMINATING, LIPHA TECH INC., PRENTISS INCORPORATED, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC., WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.. (FISH, ERIC)
September 22, 2011 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN C. MILSTEIN on behalf of PRENTISS INCORPORATED (MILSTEIN, ALAN)
September 19, 2011 Filing 167 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/9/11, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sara L Kern/King Trancription Service, Telephone number 973 237 6080. Tape Number: Hearing. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 10/11/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2011. (tjg, )
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER re: dates on which all remaining fact depositions will occur, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 9/16/11. (jd, )
September 16, 2011 Filing 166 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
September 9, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Status Conference held on the record on 9/9/2011. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER on Informal Application & Seventh Amended Pretrial SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/15/2011 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2012 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Fact Discovery due by 10/18/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2012.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 9/9/11. (jd, )
September 7, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #163 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 10/3/2011 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
September 6, 2011 Filing 164 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs, Bayer and LiphaTech. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
September 6, 2011 Filing 163 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Guardian ad Litem for Bryonna Blackshear), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Administratrix of the Estate of Keith Blackshear, deceased), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(Individually), KEITH BLACKSHEAR. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification 1 of 2, #3 Certification 2 of 2)(RINALDO, RICHARD)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TEXT ORDER - At the request of defendant, Sygenta, and with the consent of all other parties, defendant Sygenta's Minnesota counsel may participate in the conference set for September 9, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. (New Jersey time) via telephone. Sygenta's counsel shall call chambers at 973-645-6596 and his call will be transferred to Courtroom 5A.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 9/1/11. (drc, )
August 30, 2011 Filing 161 Letter from ROBERT J. MACHI ON BEHALF OF DEF. SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION. (MACHI, ROBERT)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER on Informal Application that the pltfs' request to extend the deadline to complete depositions is granted and fact discovery shall be completed no later than 9/18/11; no later than 9/6/11, the parties shall submit a letter setting forth the dates on which all remaining fact depositions shall be completed; pltfs' request for leave to file an Amended Complaint to name BASF, DOW, MGK, JT Eaton, and Environmental Health Products is denied without prejudice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 8/29/11. (jd, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 TEXT ORDER, (The in-person conference scheduled for 9/8/11 has been rescheduled for 9/9/2011 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.)ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 8/23/11. (Liriano, I)
August 17, 2011 Filing 158 Letter from Joint Letter. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
July 22, 2011 Filing 157 Letter from Joint letter from Jeanine D. Clark and Daniel Perez. (CLARK, JEANINE)
July 20, 2011 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN F. DONATH on behalf of CORBETT EXTERMINATING(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) (DONATH, JONATHAN)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER on Informal Application that the pltfs' request to compel the production of invoices reflecting the purchase of safety equipment is denied, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/19/11. (jd, )
July 19, 2011 Filing 153 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
July 19, 2011 Filing 152 Letter from JOINT DEFENSE LETTER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' AND CORBETT'S JOINT LETTER OF JULY 19, 2011 (#151) re #151 Letter. (MACHI, ROBERT)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER on Informal Application that deft Bell's request that the Court dismiss the claims agst it or compel pltfs to submit a dismissal is denied; pltfs' request that the Court remove the 7/15/11 letter from the docket, etc. is denied; that deft Bell and the pltfs shall meet in-person or via telephone to address the purported deficiencies, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/18/11. (jd, )
July 18, 2011 Filing 151 Letter from Joint Letter (Blackshear and Corbett). (RINALDO, RICHARD)
July 18, 2011 Filing 150 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
July 15, 2011 Filing 149 Letter from Jeanine D. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(CLARK, JEANINE)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to Deft Speckoz, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 7/14/11. (jd, )
July 11, 2011 Filing 147 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/5/11, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charlene P. Scognamiglio, Telephone number 973 237 6080. Tape Number: Hearing. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 8/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2011. (tjg, )
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER on Informal Application that, no later than 7/14/11, the following defts shall produce the following toxicity studies and/or inert ingredient lists: (1) as to deft Syngenta,(a)Syngenta Demon WP and (b) Demon TC; and (2) as to deft Whitmire,(a)PT175 Microcare, (b)PT 280 Orthene, (c)ULD BP300, (d) Advance Ant Bait, and )c) PT 180; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/5/11. (jd, )
July 5, 2011 Filing 144 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as to Speckoz, Inc. ONLY by SPECKOZ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Speckoz only)(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Order on Informal Application & Sixth Amended Pretrial SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Status Conference set for 9/8/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Fact Discovery due by 7/22/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/1/11. (jd, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 143 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/20/11, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sara L. Kern/King Transcription Service, Telephone number 973 237 6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 7/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2011. (tjg, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) re #138 Order on Oral Motion, Notice of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(MACHI, ROBERT)
July 1, 2011 Filing 141 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
July 1, 2011 CLERK'S TEXT NOTE - DOCKET ENTRY NO. 140 WAS SUBMITTED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. (dc, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 140 NOTICE by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) re #138 Order on Oral Motion, Notice of Compliance (MACHI, ROBERT)
June 29, 2011 Filing 139 Letter from Parties (Joint Letter) Machi, Robert. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits 3 and 4)(MACHI, ROBERT)
June 20, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Status Conference held on the record on 6/20/2011. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER on Informal Application that, no later than 6/22/11, the parties shall supplement their Rule 26 disclosures and interrogatory responses, etc.; the pltfs request for leave to file an amended complaint to join two parties is denied without prejudice and may be renewed after its affirmative expert report is disclosed, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 6/20/11. (jd, )
June 20, 2011 Filing 137 Letter from H. Lockwood Miller, III. (MILLER, H.)
June 20, 2011 Filing 136 Letter from Robert J. Machi, Esq. in response to Plaintiff's letter of June 18, 2011 raising discovery issues. (MACHI, ROBERT)
June 18, 2011 Filing 135 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
June 18, 2011 Filing 134 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER on Informal Application that all parties shall provide their experts the information that they want the experts to consider on a rolling basis so that the deadlines are met. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 6/9/11. (jd, )
June 9, 2011 Filing 132 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER on Informal Application & Fifth Amended Pretrial SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Status Conference set for 6/20/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Discovery due by 7/22/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2011., Status Conference set for 9/8/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 6/3/11. (jd, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 130 Letter from Parties (Joint Letter). (RINALDO, RICHARD)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER that Pltf's request for leave to file a motion to remand at this time is denied. If the motion to dismiss is denied, then the case will be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 5/26/11. (jd, )
May 25, 2011 Filing 128 Letter from H. Lockwood Miller, III. (MILLER, H.)
May 24, 2011 Filing 127 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER that the parties are hereby notified that such a statement does not mean that experts identified after the 5/10/11 deadline will be permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 5/19/11. (jd, )
May 19, 2011 Filing 125 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
May 10, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 5/10/2011. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER on Informal Application & Fourth Amended Pretrial SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., in-person Status Conference set for 6/20/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Discovery due by 7/22/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2011., in-person Status Conference set for 9/8/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 5/10/11. (jd, )
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TEXT ORDER, The May 10, 2011 telephone conference has been converted to an in-person hearing on May 10, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. in the Martin Luther King, Jr., Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, Newark, New Jersey. At the hearing, each party shall be prepared to report the discovery that has been completed, the discovery left to complete, and the status of the expert reports and the plaintiff shall be prepared to explain whether or not it has complied with the discovery orders that directed the production of information and that if there has not been compliance, provide a detailed explanation as to why they have not complied with such Orders. All deadlines shall remain in full force and effect. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 5/4/11. (Liriano, I)
May 3, 2011 Filing 122 Letter from all Defense Counsel. (MACHI, ROBERT)
May 2, 2011 Filing 121 Letter from H. Lockwood Miller, III. (MILLER, H.)
April 28, 2011 Filing 120 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
April 25, 2011 Filing 119 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand 3rd Amended, CROSSCLAIM against BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), BELL LABORATORIES(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), CORBETT EXTERMINATING(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), LIPHA TECH INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), PRENTISS INCORPORATED(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), SANDOZ AGRO, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), WELLMARK INTERNATIONAL, WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) by SPECKOZ, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey).(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
April 25, 2011 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - PLEASE DISREGARD THE ANSWER DOC.# 118 PER ATTY - ENTERED IN ERROR (nr, )
April 25, 2011 Filing 118 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Third, Amended CROSSCLAIM against SHANE A. ANDERSON, BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), BELL LABORATORIES(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), CORBETT EXTERMINATING(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), LIPHA TECH INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), JOHN P. MANDLER, PRENTISS INCORPORATED(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), SANDOZ AGRO, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), JAMES E. SPRINGER II, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), WELLMARK INTERNATIONAL, WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) by SPECKOZ, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey).(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2011 Filing 117 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re #105 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CORBETT EXTERMINATING. (MILLER, H.)
April 6, 2011 Filing 116 Letter from Jeanine D. Clark. (CLARK, JEANINE)
April 4, 2011 Filing 115 BRIEF in Opposition re #105 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Administratrix of the Estate of Keith Blackshear, deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Brief)(RINALDO, RICHARD)
April 4, 2011 Filing 114 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT), AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWER TO ALL CROSSCLAIMS AND, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC..(MACHI, ROBERT)
April 4, 2011 Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRENTISS INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
April 4, 2011 Filing 112 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC..(KELLY, ROBERT)
April 4, 2011 Filing 111 Prentiss Incorporated ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, Third CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by PRENTISS INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
March 31, 2011 Filing 110 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Plainitff's third amended complaint), CROSSCLAIM against BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), CORBETT EXTERMINATING(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), DEF COMPANY((a fictitious name of a business authorized to do business in New Jersey)), JOHN DOES 1-100((fictitious names)), LIPHA TECH INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), PRENTISS INCORPORATED(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), RICHARD ROES 1-100, SANDOZ AGRO, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), SPECKOZ, INC., JAMES E. SPRINGER II, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), WELLMARK INTERNATIONAL, WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) by BELL LABORATORIES(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey).(CLARK, JEANINE)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER on Informal Application & Second Amended Pretrial SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/10/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Fact Discovery due by 7/22/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2011., Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Defts shall file Answers to the Third Amended Complaint no later than 4/4/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/29/11. (jd, )
March 28, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 3/28/2011. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
March 28, 2011 Filing 108 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/19/11, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sara L. Kern/King Transcription Service, Telephone number 973 237 6080. Tape Number: Opinion. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 4/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2011. (tjg, )
March 25, 2011 Filing 107 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE.(FISH, ERIC)
March 25, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #105 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 4/18/2011 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TEXT ORDER, There shall be a telephone conference on March 28, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call.ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/25/11. (Liriano, I)
March 25, 2011 Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss by CORBETT EXTERMINATING. Responses due by 4/4/2011 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, H.)
March 24, 2011 Filing 104 Letter from H. Lockwood Miller, III. (MILLER, H.)
March 23, 2011 Filing 103 Letter from Plaintiffs correcting the record. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
March 23, 2011 Filing 102 Letter from Plaintiffs Requesting Scheduling Conference and Interim Relief. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
March 22, 2011 Filing 101 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WELLMARK INTERNATIONAL Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Jane DelleMonache* (jd, )
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER on Informal Application that the Third Amended Complaint filed on 3/11/11 (doc #89) shall be deemed filed as of that date, etc.; deft Corbett's motion to dismiss (doc #67) is terminated without prejudice and it shall be refiled and directed to the Third Amended Complaint, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/21/11. (jd, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 98 Letter from Plaintiff regarding Amended Complaint pursuant to Text Order. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER on Informal Application re: responses to Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/17/11. (jd, )
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER on Informal Application that the request to be relieved from presenting disputes via joint letter protocol is denied, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/17/11. (jd, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 95 Letter from JOINT LETTER FROM COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS: BAYER, BELL, SPECHOZ, SYNGENTA & WHITMORE re #94 Letter. (MACHI, ROBERT)
March 17, 2011 Filing 94 Letter from Plaintiffs seeking relief from Order. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER on Informal Application that, no later than 3/30/11, the pltfs shall produce the tax returns of Keith Blackshear for the years 1996 through 2007, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/16/11. (jd, )
March 15, 2011 Filing 93 Letter from Plaintiff pursuant to Joint Letter Protocol. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
March 15, 2011 Filing 92 Letter from Joint Letter from Counsel for Defendant Syngenta and Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(MACHI, ROBERT)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TEXT ORDER, Because leave of Court was not granted and there is no indication that the other parties have consented to the filing of the Third Amended Complaint, no later than March 18, 2011, the plaintiffs shall notify the Court if any party opposes the plaintiffs' filing of the Third Amended Complaint. If the other parties consent, then the plaintiffs shall submit a proposed form of Order permitting them to file the Third Amended Complaint. If such an Order is entered, then defendant Corbett shall refile its motion to dismiss and direct it toward the Third Amended Complaint.ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/15/11. (Liriano, I)
March 14, 2011 Filing 90 Letter from H. Lockwood Miller, III. (MILLER, H.)
March 11, 2011 Filing 89 AMENDED COMPLAINT joining Wellmark International against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Administratrix of the Estate of Keith Blackshear, deceased), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(Individually), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Guardian ad Litem for Bryonna Blackshear), KEITH BLACKSHEAR. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RINALDO, RICHARD)
February 25, 2011 Pro Hac Vice fee as to James L. Moore: $ 150.00, receipt number NEW006000 (jd, )
February 24, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 2/24/2011. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER on Informal Application that, no later than 3/2/11, the pltfs shall provide certified responses to all interrogatories (other than those served by Lipha Tech), etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 2/24/11. (jd, )
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James L. Moore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 2/22/11. (jd, )
February 17, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 3/21/2011 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
February 16, 2011 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erich Fish, #2 Certification of James Moore, #3 Text of Proposed Order for admission of James Moore Pro Hac Vice)(FISH, ERIC)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER on Informal Application that, no later than 2/24/11, the Pltf shall provide responses to the interrogatories and document demands served by Deft Corbett; during the telephone conference scheduled for 2/24/11 at 2:00 p.m., the Pltfs shall be prepared to give a status of all discovery, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 2/15/11. (jd, )
February 15, 2011 Filing 84 Letter from Counsel for Corbett Exterminating. (MILLER, H.)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re: Discovery Demands. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 2/14/11. (jd, )
February 10, 2011 Filing 82 Letter from Joint Letter from Defense Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 5-9, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 10-13)(MACHI, ROBERT)
February 10, 2011 Filing 81 Letter from Jeanine D. Clark re #79 Order on Oral Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(CLARK, JEANINE)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER on Informal Application that the request embodied in the defts' letter dated 2/2/11 is denied without prejudice; discovery disputes raised in the dated 2/2/11 letter shall be presented, no later than 2/10/11 at noon via joint letter protocol, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 2/7/11. (jd, )
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER on Informal Application that the request embodied in the defts' letter dated 1/26/11 is denied without prejudice; the discovery disputes raised in the dated 1/26/11 letter shall be presented, no later than 2/10/11 at noon via joint letter protocol, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 2/3/11. (jd, )
February 2, 2011 Filing 78 Letter from DEFENDANTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(MACHI, ROBERT)
January 6, 2011 Filing 77 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Shane Anderson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MACHI, ROBERT)
December 15, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 12/15/2010. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER on Informal Application: setting Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2010. ETC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/15/10. (tjg,)
November 29, 2010 Filing 75 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re #67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CORBETT EXTERMINATING. (MILLER, H.)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER on Informal Application & Amended Pretrial SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/15/2010 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2011., Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2011., Joinder of Parties due by 2/25/2011., Dispositi e Motions due by 2/25/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2011., Telephone Conference set for 2/24/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 11/24/10. (jd, )
November 24, 2010 Filing 73 Letter from Robert Machi, Esq.. (MACHI, ROBERT)
November 23, 2010 Filing 72 Letter from Jeanine D. Clark. (CLARK, JEANINE)
November 23, 2010 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Dismiss (letter brief) filed by BELL LABORATORIES(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey). (CLARK, JEANINE)
November 22, 2010 Filing 70 BRIEF in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Administratrix of the Estate of Keith Blackshear, deceased), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(Individually), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Guardian ad Litem for Bryonna Blackshear), KEITH BLACKSHEAR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(RINALDO, RICHARD)
November 17, 2010 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Shane A. Anderson: $ 150.00, receipt number NEW003869 (jd, )
November 16, 2010 Filing 69 ANSWER to Crossclaim of SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC, and of BELL LABORATORIES ANSWER to Crossclaim of PRENTISS, ANSWER to Crossclaim of Speckoz, Inc., ANSWER to Crossclaim Bayer CropScience LP by WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey).(DELANEY, CHRISTINE)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shane A. Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 11/15/10. (jd, )
November 12, 2010 Set Deadlines as to #67 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 12/6/2010 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss by CORBETT EXTERMINATING. Responses due by 11/22/2010 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, H.)
November 12, 2010 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORBETT EXTERMINATING. (MILLER, H.)
November 11, 2010 Filing 65 Certification of CERTIFICATION OF ROBERT J. MACHI on behalf of SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC. Re #49 Motion for Leave to Appear,. (Attachments: #1 Certification Shane A. Anderson)(MACHI, ROBERT)
November 7, 2010 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - re: doc #s 58-61 filed by R. Machi on 11/5/10. Documents are Answers to Crossclaims (jd, )
November 5, 2010 Filing 64 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Whitmire Micro-Gen Research Laboratories, Inc., ANSWER to Crossclaim Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc., ANSWER to Crossclaim Bell Laboratories, ANSWER to Crossclaim Prentiss Incorporated, ANSWER to Crossclaim Speckoz, Inc. and Bayer Crop Science LP by LIPHA TECH INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey).(GALE, EVERETT)
November 5, 2010 Filing 63 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by LIPHA TECH INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey).(GALE, EVERETT)
November 5, 2010 Filing 62 ANSWER to Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE.(FISH, ERIC)
November 5, 2010 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC. by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC..(MACHI, ROBERT)
November 5, 2010 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against SPECKOZ, INC. by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC..(MACHI, ROBERT)
November 5, 2010 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against PRENTISS INCORPORATED by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC..(MACHI, ROBERT)
November 5, 2010 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against PRENTISS INCORPORATED by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC..(MACHI, ROBERT)
November 5, 2010 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Answers to Crossclaim (doc #s 54-57) filed by R. Machi on 11/5/10 was submitted incorrectly as a Claim. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Answers to Crossclaim USING correct event which can be found under Answer to Complaint. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
November 5, 2010 Filing 57 CLAIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR CONTRIBUTION & INDEMNITY OF WHITMIRE by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (MACHI, ROBERT)
November 5, 2010 Filing 56 CLAIM ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS OF SPECKOZ by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (MACHI, ROBERT)
November 5, 2010 Filing 55 CLAIM ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM OF PRENTISS by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (MACHI, ROBERT)
November 5, 2010 Filing 54 CLAIM answer to crossclaim by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (MACHI, ROBERT)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that the time within which Corbett Exterminating may answer Amended Complaint is extended up to and including 11/12/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 11/3/10. (jd, )
November 3, 2010 Filing 52 Letter from H. Lockwood Miller, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, H.)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Discovery Confidentiality ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/28/10. (jd, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT/Certification in support of discovery confidentiality order by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER, #2 Certificate of Service)(MACHI, ROBERT)
October 27, 2010 Set Deadlines as to #49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 12/6/2010 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATION OF SHANE A. ANDERSON, #2 CERTIFICATION OF ROBERT MACHI, #3 DEFENDANT SYNGENTA CROP, #4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JAMES E. SPRINGER, #5 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUB OF COUNSEL, #6 CERT OF SERVOCE)(MACHI, ROBERT)
October 18, 2010 Filing 48 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (second) by WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC..(KELLY, ROBERT)
October 18, 2010 Filing 47 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (second), Second CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PRENTISS INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
October 13, 2010 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Crossclaim by SPECKOZ, INC..(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 12, 2010 Filing 45 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Bayer CropScience LP improperly plead as "Bayer Environmental Science" by BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE.(FISH, ERIC)
October 12, 2010 Filing 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), CORBETT EXTERMINATING, DEF COMPANY((a fictitious name of a business authorized to do business in New Jersey)), JOHN DOES 1-100((fictitious names)), LIPHA TECH INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), JOHN P. MANDLER, PRENTISS INCORPORATED, RICHARD ROES 1-100, SANDOZ AGRO, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), SPECKOZ, INC., JAMES E. SPRINGER II, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey), WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) by BELL LABORATORIES(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey).(CLARK, JEANINE)
October 12, 2010 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC. re #42 Answer to Amended Complaint (MACHI, ROBERT)
October 12, 2010 Filing 42 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC..(MACHI, ROBERT)
October 8, 2010 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Administratrix of the Estate of Keith Blackshear, deceased). CORBETT EXTERMINATING served on 9/30/2010, answer due 10/21/2010. (jd, )
October 1, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2010. (aa, )
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Pretrial SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/15/2010 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2011. Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 2/25/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2011. Telephone Conference set for 5/10/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2011 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/1/10. (jd, )
September 29, 2010 Filing 39 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CORBETT EXTERMINATING Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Jane DelleMonache* (jd, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Administratrix of the Estate of Keith Blackshear, deceased), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(Individually), JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR(as Guardian ad Litem for Bryonna Blackshear), KEITH BLACKSHEAR. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RINALDO, RICHARD)
September 28, 2010 Filing 37 Joint Discovery Plan by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MACHI, ROBERT)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER on Informal Application that the Pltf shall file a Second Amended Complaint without prejudice to the defts' right to move to dismiss it once the employer is served and enters an appearance, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 9/22/10. (jd, )
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER on Informal Application that the request to adjourn the in-person 10/1/10 Rule 16 Conference is denied, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 9/13/10. (jd, )
September 13, 2010 Filing 34 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
September 9, 2010 Filing 33 Letter from Robert J. Machi, Esq.. (MACHI, ROBERT)
August 31, 2010 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BELL LABORATORIES(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (CLARK, JEANINE)
August 31, 2010 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard document #31 filed on 8/31/10 by J. Clark - to be refiled. (sr, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BELL LABORATORIES(a business entity authorized to do business in New Jersey) identifying n/a as Corporate Parent.. (CLARK, JEANINE)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Scheduling ORDER in an Arbitration Case, Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2010 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 8/24/10. (jd, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 29 Certification of CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE on behalf of SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC. Re #28 Answer to Crossclaim,. (MACHI, ROBERT)
August 23, 2010 Filing 28 ANSWER to Crossclaim, ANSWER to Crossclaim by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(MACHI, ROBERT)
August 18, 2010 Filing 27 Defendant, Prentiss, Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim of Bell Laboratories, Inc. by PRENTISS INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
August 16, 2010 Filing 26 Letter from Everett Gale in Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Complaint to Add Affirmative Claims Against Corbett Exterminating. (GALE, EVERETT)
August 13, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE MARIE DELANEY on behalf of WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC. (DELANEY, CHRISTINE)
August 13, 2010 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.. (KELLY, ROBERT)
August 6, 2010 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC..(KELLY, ROBERT)
August 6, 2010 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James E. Springer, II, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-3260013.) (MACHI, ROBERT)
August 6, 2010 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John P. Mandler, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-3259970.) (MACHI, ROBERT)
August 4, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER BRIAN BLADEL on behalf of LIPHA TECH INC. (BLADEL, CHRISTOPHER)
August 4, 2010 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by LIPHA TECH INC..(GALE, EVERETT)
August 4, 2010 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BELL LABORATORIES.(DEZII, DAWN)
August 4, 2010 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Answer (doc #17) submitted by J. Clark on 8/3/10 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
August 3, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BELL LABORATORIES.(CLARK, JEANINE)
August 3, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule Conference set for 10/1/2010 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (jd, )
August 2, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 8/2/2010. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John P. Mandler and James E. Springer,II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 8/2/10. (jd, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; no later than 8/6/10, Defts Whitmere, Bell and Liphathech shall file their Answers to the Amended Complaint, etc.; there shall be a conference on 10/1/10 at 1:45 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 8/2/10. (jd, )
August 2, 2010 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Motion set for 9/7/2010 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
August 2, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BELL LABORATORIES. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Counsel/Motion)(CLARK, JEANINE)
August 1, 2010 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 9/7/2010 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
July 30, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Certification, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certification)(MACHI, ROBERT)
July 30, 2010 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRENTISS INCORPORATED. (MILSTEIN, ALAN)
July 30, 2010 Filing 11 Defendant, Prentiss Incorporated's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by PRENTISS INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER, (There shall be a telephone conference set for 8/2/2010 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call.)ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/29/10. (Liriano, I)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER, (There shall be a telephone conference set for 8/2/2010 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call.)ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/29/10. (Liriano, I)
July 27, 2010 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SPECKOZ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only))(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 27, 2010 Filing 7 Letter from Richard P. Rinaldo, Esq.. (RINALDO, RICHARD)
July 22, 2010 Filing 6 Bayer CropScience LP's (improperly pled as "Bayer Environmental Science") ANSWER to Complaint by BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE.(FISH, ERIC)
July 22, 2010 Filing 5 Certification on behalf of SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC. Re #3 Answer to Complaint, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MACHI, ROBERT)
July 22, 2010 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC. identifying Syngenta Seeds, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MACHI, ROBERT)
July 22, 2010 Filing 3 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC..(MACHI, ROBERT)
July 15, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ld, )
July 15, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIPHA TECH INC. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, )
July 15, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIPHA TECH INC. from NJ SUPERIOR COURT LAW DIVISION: MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L-1659-09. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 3224712) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLACKSHEAR et al v. SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITMIRE MICRO-GEN RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINE MARIE DELANEY
Represented By: ROBERT JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL LABORATORIES
Represented By: JEANINE D. CLARK
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT J. MACHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRENTISS INCORPORATED
Represented By: DEBORAH L. GRUBER
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECKOZ, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JT EATON & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ AGRO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE
Represented By: ERIC R. FISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORBETT EXTERMINATING
Represented By: JONATHAN F. DONATH
Represented By: H. LOCKWOOD MILLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLMARK INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: RUSSELL SCOTT BURNSIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPHA TECH INC.
Represented By: EVERETT E. GALE, III
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BRIAN BLADEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOW AGROSCIENCES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH BLACKSHEAR
Represented By: RICHARD P. RINALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANETTE BLACKSHEAR
Represented By: RICHARD P. RINALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PHV SHANE A. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PHV JAMES E. SPRINGER II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PHV JOHN P. MANDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?