GARCIA v. BARTKOWSKI
Petitioner: AGUSTIN GARCIA
Respondent: GREG BARTKOWSKI
Case Number: 2:2011cv03689
Filed: June 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Dennis M. Cavanaugh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/23/17. (sr, )
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 11/30/2016. (JB, )
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dismissing as moot 52 Motion for Leave to File before USDC pursuant to [Fed.R.Civ.P.60(b)] for relief from Judgment or Order. Signed by Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 8/31/16. (sr, ) (N/M)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION. Signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise on 4/23/2015. (nr, )
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION. Signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise on 4/16/2015. (nr, )
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION. Signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise on 2/27/2015. (nr, )
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 8/1/2012. (nr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARCIA v. BARTKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AGUSTIN GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GREG BARTKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?